Swaggerty v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: James Swaggerty
Defendant: Alec Machiels, Mark S. Kristoff, Charles R. Henry, Jack E. Thompson, Russell D. Ball, RCF Management, L.L.C, Pegasus Capital Advisors, L.P., Molycorp, Inc., Mark A. Smith, John L. Burba, John F. Ashburn, Jr., James S. Allen, Ross R. Bhappu and Brian T. Dolan
Case Number: 1:2012cv00589
Filed: March 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109 Breach of Fiduciary Duties
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING ALL CONSOLIDATED CASES: The Clerk shall file a copy of this order in the consolidated cases (12-cv-589-WJM-KLM and 13-cv-3155-WJM-KLM), and such cases shall likewise be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. By Judge William J. Martinez on 1/15/2015. (alowe)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 52 Plaintiffs Thomas Wells and James Swaggertys Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Related Actions. All future filings shall contain the caption as set forth and shall be docketed under Civil Action No. 12-cv-0447- WJM-KLM. The Clerk shall docket a copy of this Order in 12-cv-00589-WJM-KMT, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/8/2013.(ervsl, )
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REOPENING CASE and Directing Status Report, Status Report due by 9/24/2013, by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/10/2013. (ervsl, )
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Proceed in one Jurisdiction and Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and Plaintiffs are given leave to re-file the Related Actions in the Delaware Court of Chancery, by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/16/2012. (ervsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swaggerty v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alec Machiels
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Kristoff
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles R. Henry
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack E. Thompson
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell D. Ball
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCF Management, L.L.C
Represented By: Daniel F. Wake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pegasus Capital Advisors, L.P.
Represented By: Stephen M. Baldini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molycorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Smith
Represented By: Rana Nader
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Burba
Represented By: Rana Nader
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Ashburn, Jr.
Represented By: Rana Nader
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S. Allen
Represented By: Rana Nader
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross R. Bhappu
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian T. Dolan
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Swaggerty
Represented By: Brian James Robbins
Represented By: George Carlos Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?