Digital Advertising Displays, Inc. v. Newforth Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Digital Advertising Displays Inc
Defendant: Newforth Partners, LLC, Sherwood Partners, LLC, Tim Cox, Robert Hoffer and Dhando Investments Inc
Case Number: 1:2012cv00682
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 367 LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to #361 Notice of Appeal filed by Digital Advertising Displays Inc. All transcripts ordered are now on file as of 11/8/2019. ( Appeal No. 20-1014) Text Only Entry (tsher, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 366 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #361 Notice of Appeal by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc (Halepaska, John)
January 10, 2020 Filing 365 USCA Case Number 20-1014 for #361 Notice of Appeal filed by Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (tsher, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 364 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #361 Notice of Appeal filed by Digital Advertising Displays Inc to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record)(tsher, )
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MINUTE ORDER granting #360 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/8/2020. Attorney Peter R. Bornstein terminated from the case. (tsher, )
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 362 MINUTE ORDER denying #359 Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/8/2020.(tsher, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 361 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number 1082-7085538) (Halepaska, John)
January 7, 2020 Filing 360 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bornstein, Peter)
January 6, 2020 Filing 359 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Halepaska, John)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 358 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #357 Motion for Extension of Time to File by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/31/2019.(jgonz, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 357 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Halepaska, John)
December 30, 2019 Filing 356 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John David Halepaska on behalf of Digital Advertising Displays IncAttorney John David Halepaska added to party Digital Advertising Displays Inc(pty:pla) (Halepaska, John)
December 9, 2019 Filing 355 REPLY to Response to #351 MOTION for Contempt Citation filed by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Bornstein, Peter)
December 9, 2019 Filing 354 Civil Case Terminated pursuant #353 Order entered on 12/9/2019. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER denying #351 Motion for Contempt Citation. Further, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/9/2019.(jgonz, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 352 BRIEF in Opposition to #351 MOTION for Contempt Citation DEFENDANTS DHANDO INVESTMENTS, INC. AND ROBERT HOFFER'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT CITATION filed by Defendant Dhando Investments Inc. (Chen, Quynh)
November 11, 2019 Filing 351 MOTION for Contempt Citation by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Bornstein, Peter)
November 8, 2019 Filing 350 TRANSCRIPT of TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/31/2019 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-26. Prepared by: AB Court Reporting & Video, Inc.. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (AB Court Reporting & Video, Inc., )
October 31, 2019 Filing 349 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 10/31/2019. Motions due on or before 11/10/2019, if no motions are filed the case will be closed. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/24/2019. Status Conference set for 10/31/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 MINUTE ORDER granting #346 Motion to Reset Status Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/15/2019. The Status Conference currently set in this case for 10/18/2019 is VACATED. (tsher, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 346 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Status Conference by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Bornstein, Peter)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MINUTE ORDER re: #344 Status Report filed by Digital Advertising Displays Inc. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/10/2019. Status Conference set for 10/18/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 344 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bornstein, Peter)
September 16, 2019 Filing 343 TRANSCRIPT of TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 09/04/2019 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-19. Prepared by: AB Court Reporting & Video, Inc.. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (AB Court Reporting & Video, Inc., )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/16/18 DENYING without prejudice #335 Plaintiff's Motion for Delay Damages, Attorney Fees, and Costs. In light of the current posture of the case and ongoing discussions among the Court and the parties, the motion is denied without prejudice with leave to re-file if discussions fail to resolve the case.(nmarb, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 9/4/2019. ORDERED: A Joint Status Report is due in 30 days, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MINUTE ORDER re: #339 Status Report filed by Digital Advertising Displays Inc by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/29/2019. Status Conference set for 9/4/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 339 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Bornstein, Peter)
July 21, 2019 Filing 338 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on June 20, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-86. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 337 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Bornstein, Peter)
June 20, 2019 Filing 336 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/20/2019. ORDERED: Parties shall notify the Court of the status of settlement negotiations in 15 days. The case is STAYED. FTR: 501. (morti, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 335 MOTION for Damages , Attorney Fees, and Costs by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Bornstein, Peter)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MINUTE ORDER granting #331 Motion for Leave to Restrict by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/7/2019. The Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain the document located at ECF No. #327 under Restriction Level 1 until further order of the court.(tsher, )
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/4/2019. Motion Hearing is VACATED and RESET to 6/20/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/31/2019 re: #326 Objections filed by Digital Advertising Displays Inc, #327 Restricted Document - Level 1, filed by Robert Hoffer, Dhando Investments Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 331 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendants Dhando Investments Inc, Robert Hoffer. (Chen, Quynh)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MINUTE ORDER granting #329 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/30/2019. Attorney Hannah Theresa Yang terminated. (mdave, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 329 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Hannah T. Yang by Defendants Dhando Investments Inc, Robert Hoffer. (Yang, Hannah)
May 28, 2019 Filing 328 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Quynh My Chen on behalf of Dhando Investments Inc, Robert HofferAttorney Quynh My Chen added to party Dhando Investments Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Quynh My Chen added to party Robert Hoffer(pty:dft) (Chen, Quynh)
May 20, 2019 Filing 327 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendants Dhando Investments Inc, Robert Hoffer.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Software License Compliant with Material Terms of Settlement, #2 Exhibit B: Comparison of Proposed License with Material Terms of Settlement and Comments as to the Same)(Springer, Colby)
May 20, 2019 Filing 326 OBJECTIONS to #325 Restricted Document - Level 1 Court's Software License Agreement by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Bornstein, Peter)
May 13, 2019 Filing 325 ATTACHMENT TO #324 Minute Order - Level 1, Software License Agreement. (mdave, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/13/2019. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's proposed license agreement and has edited it to conform to the executed Material Terms of Settlement Agreement. The Court's edited version is attached hereto as an Attachment. The Clerk of the Court shall file the Attachment under Restriction Level 1 and maintain the document under restriction until further order of the Court. The parties shall submit, on or before 5/20/2019, any objections. (mdave, )
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 323 MINUTE ORDER granting #322 Motion for Leave to Restrict #321 Restricted Document - Level 1 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/10/2019.(mdave, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 322 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendants Dhando Investments Inc, Robert Hoffer. (Yang, Hannah)
April 19, 2019 Filing 321 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc. And Robert Hoffer's Summation Brief by Defendants Dhando Investments Inc, Robert Hoffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Defendants... Annotated License Agreement and Briefing in Support of Effectuating the Material Terms of Settlement....), #2 Exhibit B (Defendants... Reply Brief in Support of Effectuating the Material Terms of Settlement....))(Springer, Colby) Modified on 4/24/2019 to add document title (tsher, ).
April 19, 2019 Filing 320 BRIEF Closing Argument by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bornstein, Peter)
April 7, 2019 Filing 319 TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on March 21, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-139. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 318 LETTER re: #316 Evidentiary Hearing, Service Date of HOFFER-DAD-000551 (Exhibit 8) by Defendants Dhando Investments Inc, Robert Hoffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (FTP Transfer), #2 Exhibit B (FTP Download Confirmation))(Springer, Colby)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 317 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/21/2019. (mdave, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 316 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/21/2019. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2019: #1 Plaintiff's Exhibit list) (mdave, ).
March 3, 2019 Filing 315 TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing held on February 19, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-25. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 314 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting in part #288 Renewed Motion to Reopen Case to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Status Conference held on 2/19/2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/21/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. On or before 3/15/2019, each party shall submit an annotated licensing agreement to Hegarty_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov and to opposing counsel. The Clerk of Court shall restrict at level 1 [288-1] Material Terms of Settlement Agreement as requested by the defendant. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, ) Modified on 3/18/2019 to edit text (mdave, ).
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/30/2019. Status Conference is VACATED and RESET to 2/19/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/25/2019. Status Conference set for 2/7/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/18/2019. This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty as the presiding Judge. All future pleadings should be designated as 12-cv-682-MEH (angar, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 310 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc All parties consent.. (Bornstein, Peter)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/7/2019. Consent Form due by 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 308 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 12/20/2018. Parties are to confer and contact Chambers via email regarding possible consent on or before end of business day on 1/2/2019. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/14/2018. Status Conference set for 12/20/2018 01:15 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 306 STATUS REPORT by Defendants Dhando Investments Inc, Robert Hoffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Springer, Colby)
December 4, 2018 Filing 305 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Bornstein, Peter)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MINUTE ORDER re: #288 Renewed MOTION to Reopen Case to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Digital Advertising Displays Inc by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/20/2018. Status Report due by 12/4/2018. Text Only Entry (mdave, )
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MINUTE ORDER re: #288 Renewed MOTION to Reopen Case to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Digital Advertising Displays Inc by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/20/2018. Status Report due by 11/28/2018. (mdave, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 302 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Bornstein, Peter)
October 30, 2018 Filing 301 MINUTE ENTRY FOR SETTLEMENT for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Supplemental settlement negotiations held on 10/29/2018. (mdave, )
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/29/2018. Status Report informing the Court regarding a license consistent with the terms of the executed "Material Terms of Settlement Agreement - Confidential" due by 11/5/2018. (mdave, )
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/29/2018. Settlement Conference set for 9/12/2018 is vacated and rescheduled to 10/29/2018 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/15/2018. A Supplemental Settlement Conference set for 9/12/2018 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
June 12, 2018 Filing 297 REPLY to Response to #288 Renewed MOTION to Reopen Case to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bornstein, Peter)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MINUTE ORDER granting #290 Motion for Leave to Restrict by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/5/2018. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain the documents located at ECF No. 291 under Restriction Level 1 until further order of the Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain the documents located at ECF No. 294 under Restriction Level 1 until further order of the Court. (tsher, )
May 30, 2018 Filing 295 MEMORANDUM regarding #290 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Robert Hoffer, Dhando Investments Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/30/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 29, 2018 Filing 294 DUPLICATE ENTRY to #291 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendants Dhando Investments Inc, Robert Hoffer.. (Yang, Hannah) Modified on 5/30/2018 to show as duplicate entry pursuant to Chambers (angar, ).
May 29, 2018 Filing 293 DECLARATION of Hannah T. Yang in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Renewed Motion to Reopen regarding Brief in Opposition to Motion #292 by Defendants Dhando Investments Inc, Robert Hoffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yang, Hannah)
May 29, 2018 Filing 292 BRIEF in Opposition to #280 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Defendants Dhando Investments Inc, Robert Hoffer. (Yang, Hannah)
May 29, 2018 Filing 291 EXHIBITS RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendants Dhando Investments Inc, Robert Hoffer.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Yang, Hannah) Modified on 5/31/2018 to add title (angar, ).
May 29, 2018 Filing 290 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendants Dhando Investments Inc, Robert Hoffer. (Yang, Hannah)
May 8, 2018 Filing 289 MEMORANDUM regarding #288 Renewed MOTION to Reopen Case to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Digital Advertising Displays Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/8/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 7, 2018 Filing 288 Renewed MOTION to Reopen Case to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Bornstein, Peter)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #280 Plaintiffs Motion to Reopen to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/12/2018. (mdave, )
April 12, 2018 Filing 286 MEMORANDUM regarding #280 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Digital Advertising Displays Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/12/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 4, 2018 Filing 285 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hannah Theresa Yang on behalf of Dhando Investments Inc, Robert HofferAttorney Hannah Theresa Yang added to party Dhando Investments Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Hannah Theresa Yang added to party Robert Hoffer(pty:dft) (Yang, Hannah)
April 3, 2018 Filing 284 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Colby B. Springer on behalf of Dhando Investments Inc, Robert Hoffer (Springer, Colby)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MINUTE ORDER granting #281 Adam L. Massaro's Motion to Withdraw by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/28/2018. (mdave, )
March 27, 2018 Filing 282 MEMORANDUM regarding #281 MOTION to Withdraw of Adam L. Massaro filed by Newforth Partners, LLC, Robert Hoffer, Dhando Investments Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/27/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 26, 2018 Filing 281 MOTION to Withdraw of Adam L. Massaro by Defendants Dhando Investments Inc, Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Massaro, Adam)
March 26, 2018 Filing 280 MOTION to Reopen Case by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Bornstein, Peter)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MINUTE ORDER granting #277 Brent R. Owens Motion to Withdraw by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/15/2018. Attorney Brent Rollow Owen terminated. (mdave, )
March 14, 2018 Filing 278 MEMORANDUM regarding #277 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Newforth Partners, LLC, Robert Hoffer, Dhando Investments Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/14/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 14, 2018 Filing 277 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants Dhando Investments Inc, Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Owen, Brent)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 274 Plaintiffs Motion to Reopen and for Contempt Citation or, in the Alternative, Motion to Enforce Settlement by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/19/2017. (mdave, )
October 18, 2017 Filing 275 MEMORANDUM regarding 274 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Digital Advertising Displays Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/18/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
October 17, 2017 Filing 274 MOTION to Reopen and for Contempt Citation or in the Alternative Motion to Enforce Settlement, by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Public Entry to #273 - Text Only Entry. (angar, )
October 17, 2017 Filing 273 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Limegrover, Eric)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Restrict Public Access #270 . Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED for good cause shown. Plaintiff shall file the Motion to Reopen and for Contempt Citation or in the Alternative Motion to Enforce Settlement [270-1] as a SEPARATE docket entry on CM/ECF at RESTRICTION LEVEL 1. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/17/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
October 16, 2017 Filing 271 MOTION for Leave to Restrict Public Access. (Public Entry for Restricted document #270 ) - Text Only Entry by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (angar, )
October 16, 2017 Filing 270 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc.. (Attachments: #1 MOTION TO REOPEN AND FOR CONTEMPT CITATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 TO MOTION TO REOPEN AND FOR CONTEMPT CITATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT)(Limegrover, Eric)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MINUTE ORDER re: #264 Order Dismissing Case, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/11/2015. As noted by Judge Martinez on March11, 2015, the Court is unable to address any matters until a motion to reopen, citing good cause, is filed by on or both of the parties, through counsel, unless the party is unrepresented (slibi, )
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER denying #267 Motion for Status Conference Call. On February 2, 2015, this Court entered its Order (ECF No. 264) administratively closing this case, subject to reopening upon motion for good cause shown. At present this case remains closed, and the Court is presently unable to address any motion of the parties on the merits. As a consequence, Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED without prejudice to refiling after this case is reopened for good cause, if any there be. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 08/12/2015. Text Only Entry(wjmlc2, )
August 12, 2015 Filing 267 MOTION for status conference call regarding Material Terms of Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cthom, )
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER denying #265 Motion for Hearing/Conference. On February 2, 2015, this Court entered its Order (ECF No. 264) administratively closing this case, subject to reopening upon motion for good cause shown. At present this case remains closed, and the Court is presently unable to address any motion of the parties on the merits. As a consequence, Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED without prejudice to refiling after this case is reopened for good cause, if any there be. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/11/2015. Text Only Entry(wjmsec, )
March 5, 2015 Filing 265 MOTION for status conference call, by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (tscha, )
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER SUA SPONTE ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Plaintiff's #263 Motion for an Extension of Time is DENIED. This matter shall be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pursuant to local rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2. The parties may move to reopen this case once dismissal papers have been finalized, or for any other good cause shown. By Judge William J. Martinez on 2/2/2015. (alowe)
January 30, 2015 Filing 263 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Dismissal Documents by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc. (Gordon, Paul)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the parties' #261 Joint Status Report, filed December 10, 2014. Given the parties' apparent progress in finalizing the settlement of this matter, the parties are ORDERED to file final dismissal papers on or before January 30, 2015. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/30/2014. Text Only Entry (wjmlc2, )
December 10, 2014 Filing 261 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays Inc, Defendants Dhando Investments Inc, Newforth Partners LLC, Robert Hoffer. (Gordon, Paul) Modified filers on 12/11/2014 (alowe).
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MINUTE ORDER granting #258 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record to Defendants Newforth Partners LLC, Dhando Investments Inc and Robert Hoffer. Mr. Wooll's representation of the Defendants in this case is terminated. Defendants continue to be represented by counsel at the firm of Lewis Roca Rothgerber LLP. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/4/2014.(alowe)
December 3, 2014 Filing 259 MEMORANDUM regarding #258 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record filed by Newforth Partners, LLC, Robert Hoffer, Dhando Investments, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/03/2014. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
December 3, 2014 Filing 258 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wooll, James)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MINUTE ORDER: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. This Court was informed by the parties on 10/10/2014 that the case had settled (docket #256 ); however, the parties have not filed dismissal papers with the Court. Accordingly, the parties shall file dismissal papers or a joint status report in this case on or before 12/10/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/2/2014. (alowe)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement. Accordingly, the Final Pretrial Conference currently scheduled in this case for 10/16/2014 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/10/2014. (alowe)
October 9, 2014 Filing 255 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Settlement Conference held on 10/9/2014. The case has settled. On or before 10/31/2014, the parties shall advise the Court on the progress of submitted necessary documents to close this case. (alowe)
October 8, 2014 Filing 254 Proposed Pretrial Order (Joint) by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Springer, Colby)
September 30, 2014 Filing 253 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Settlement Conference held on 9/30/2014. Settlement negotiations have been conducted over the past month, and although no settlement has been reached as to any claims in this action, the Court will continue to work with the parties toward that end. (slibi, )
September 30, 2014 Filing 252 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 9/30/2014. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MINUTE ORDER This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are directed to appear telephonically today, September 30, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. by first conferencing together and then calling Chambers at (303) 844-4507. The parties shall be prepared to discuss the status of settlement negotiations, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/30/2014. (evana, )
September 11, 2014 Filing 250 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/11/2014. The Final Pretrial Orders were not approved; a further Final Pretrial Conference is set before the Magistrate Judge on 10/16/2014 at 11:00 a.m.. A proposed Final Pretrial Order shall be supplied by 10/8/2014. The parties shall exchange exhibit books by 10/8/2014. Discovery motions (excluding In Limine) shall be filed by 10/14/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/8/2014, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: MEH Courtroom A105. (mdave)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MINUTE ORDER granting #246 Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for One-Day Extension. The Court will consider and discuss the proposed orders submitted by the Plaintiff and Defendants at the pretrial conference on September 11, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/8/2014.(evana, )
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MEMORANDUM regarding #246 Renewed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 09/08/2014. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 5, 2014 Filing 247 Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
September 5, 2014 Filing 246 Renewed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MINUTE ORDER Denying as moot #243 Plaintiffs Motion for One-Day Extension, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/5/2014.(evana, )
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MEMORANDUM regarding #243 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 09/05/2014. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 4, 2014 Filing 243 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
September 4, 2014 Filing 242 Proposed Pretrial Order by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Springer, Colby)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MINUTE ORDER This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. Due to cancellations of other matters, the settlement conference in this case will commence at 10:00 a.m. on September 10, 2014 in Courtroom A501 on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. All other aspects of this Courts July 8, 2014 order remain in effect, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/2/2014. (evana, )
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MINUTE ORDER re: 238 Order on Motion to Continue,Pursuant to the District Courts July 7, 2014 Order docket # 238 , and the parties July 8, 2014 telephone call in accordance with that Order, the Final Pretrial Conference scheduled in this case for July 15, 2014 is vacated and rescheduled. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 9/11/2014 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/8/2014. (evana, )
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MINUTE ORDER re: 238 Order on Motion to Continue, and the parties follow- up telephone call in accordance with that Order, a settlement conference is hereby scheduled in this case. Settlement Conference set for 9/10/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/8/2014. (evana, )
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting in part the parties' Joint Motion for to Continue Pretrial Conference and Request for Referral to Mediation #237 . The Parties' Joint Motion is GRANTED for good cause shown. This matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty to hold a mediation settlement conference pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6(A). The Parties are DIRECTED to jointly contact the Chambers of Judge Hegarty on or before July 8, 2014 to schedule the Mediation Settlement Conference and for the resetting of the Final Pretrial Conference. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/07/2014. Text Only Entry(wjmsec, )
July 5, 2014 Filing 237 Joint MOTION to Continue PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUEST FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Springer, Colby)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MINUTE ORDER At the parties request, the Final Pretrial Conference scheduled in this case for June 16, 2014 is hereby vacated and rescheduled. The Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for 7/15/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/2/2014. (evana, )
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MINUTE ORDER granting #233 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 6/16/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/7/2014.(evana, )
May 6, 2014 Filing 234 MEMORANDUM regarding #233 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial Conference filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/06/2014. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 6, 2014 Filing 233 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Pre-Trial Conference by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (McWhirter, Stephen)
April 8, 2014 Filing 232 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 4/8/2014. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2014 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (cpear)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO STRIKE. Defendants' Motion to Strike #200 and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #157 are DENIED. This case shall be promptly set for a Final Pretrial Conference, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/31/2014.(dhans, )
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MINUTE ORDER Continued Status Conference set for 4/8/2014 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/28/2014. (cpear)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER Discharging the #209 Order to Show Cause, by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/25/2014. (evana, )
February 28, 2014 Filing 228 NOTICE of Compliance with Order re: Sanctions by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc. (Gordon, Paul)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER re: #221 Order on Motion for Sanctions, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs counsel, Paul Gordon, be sanctioned in the total amount of $1,115.00, to be paid to counsel for Defendant as a reasonable sanction of attorneys fees expended for email communications and preparation of the motion to restrict access. This amount shall be paid no later than February 21, 2014. Counsel for Plaintiff shall file a Notice of Compliance with Order re: Sanctions on or before February 28, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/29/2014. (evana, )
January 24, 2014 Filing 226 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE re #221 Order on Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
January 24, 2014 Filing 225 RESPONSE to #222 MOTION for Attorney Fees and in Response to Order Granting the Motion for Sanctions (Doc. No. 221) filed by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
January 15, 2014 Filing 224 ERRATA re #222 MOTION for Attorney Fees and in Response to Order Granting the Motion for Sanctions (Doc. No. 221) by Defendant Robert Hoffer. (Springer, Colby)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMORANDUM regarding #222 MOTION for Attorney Fees and in Response to Order Granting the Motion for Sanctions (Doc. No. 221) filed by Robert Hoffer. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 01/15/2014. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 15, 2014 Filing 222 DECLARATION and Supporting Documentation in Response to Order Granting the Motion for Sanctions Doc. No. #221 by Defendant Robert Hoffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Brent Owen in Support of Attorneys Fees, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Colby Springer in Support of Attorneys Fees, #3 Exhibit Declaration of James Wooll in Support of Attorneys Fees)(Springer, Colby) (Modified on 1/17/2014 Edited the title of the text to reflect the title of the document filed)(ervsl, ).
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #207 Defendant Robert Hoffer's Motion for Sanctions for Violation of a Protection [sic] Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/10/2014. (mehcd) Modified on 1/13/2014 to correct filed date (mehcd).
January 10, 2014 Filing 220 RESPONSE to #212 Brief, #209 Order to Show Cause,,, by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Massaro, Adam)
January 10, 2014 Filing 219 RESPONSE to #157 First MOTION for Summary Judgment and Show Cause Order (Response Brief) filed by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
January 6, 2014 Filing 218 REPLY to #211 Response to Motion, to Strike by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Owen, Brent)
January 6, 2014 Filing 217 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brent Rollow Owen on behalf of Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLCAttorney Brent Rollow Owen added to party Dhando Investments, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brent Rollow Owen added to party Robert Hoffer(pty:dft), Attorney Brent Rollow Owen added to party Newforth Partners, LLC(pty:dft) (Owen, Brent)
January 3, 2014 Filing 216 REPLY to Response to #207 MOTION for Sanctions for Violation of a Protection Order filed by Defendant Robert Hoffer. (Springer, Colby)
January 2, 2014 Filing 215 RESPONSE to #207 MOTION for Sanctions for Violation of a Protection Order filed by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
December 27, 2013 Filing 214 BRIEF Responsive to the Courts #209 Order and Requesting Dismissal with prejudice by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Springer, Colby) (Modified on 12/30/2013 the title of the text has been edited to reflect the title of the document filed)(ervsl, ).
December 27, 2013 Filing 213 DECLARATION of Colby B. Springer re #209 by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Springer, Colby) (Modified on 12/30/2013 Title of the text has been edited to reflect the title of the document filed)(ervsl, ).
December 27, 2013 Filing 212 Opening BRIEF in Response to #209 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amendment to Litigation Agreement)(Gordon, Paul) (Modified on 12/30/2013 The title of the text has been edited to reflect the title of the document that has been filed)(ervsl, ).
December 23, 2013 Filing 211 RESPONSE to #200 MOTION to Strike #192 Exhibits, #191 Exhibits,, For Failure to Authenticate, Failure to Product, and Failure to Comply with Rule 26(A)(2)(B) filed by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MINUTE ORDER: In light of Judge Martinez' Order to Show Cause issued 12/11/2013, the Status Conference set for 12/19/2013 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty is VACATED and will be reset upon resolution of the pending issue, if appropriate. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/12/2013. (mehcd)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 209 DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is to show cause why the lawsuit should not be dismissed pursuant the equitable factors outlined in Fed.R.Civ.P. 19(b). Plaintiff should provide clear reasons for not joining Monster Media. Responsive briefing by Defendants should seek to rebut same. Given the importance of this matter, simultaneous opening briefs of not more than 10 pages, exclusive of attorney signature blocks and certificate of service, shall be filed by no later than December 27, 2013. Response briefs of the same length shall be filed by no later than January 10, 2014. No reply briefs will be permitted, by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/11/2013. (ervsl, ) (Main Document 209 replaced on 12/11/2013 pursuant to chambers request) (ervsl, ). (Modified on 12/11/2013 replaced main document due to fomatting of PDF pursuant to the request of the Judge's chambers)(ervsl, ). (Modified on 3/25/2014 Discharged pursuant to the #229 Order)(evana, ).
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MEMORANDUM regarding #207 MOTION for Sanctions for Violation of a Protection Order filed by Robert Hoffer. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/10/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
December 10, 2013 Filing 207 MOTION for Sanctions for Violation of a Protection Order by Defendant Robert Hoffer. (Springer, Colby)
December 9, 2013 Filing 206 MOTION for Sanctions for Violation of a Protection Order by Defendant Robert Hoffer. (Springer, Colby) (Modified on 12/10/2013 An incorrect PDF was attached and it is NOT a part of this case)(ervsl, ).
December 4, 2013 Filing 205 NOTICE to Terminate Service of Filings in Case by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC (Johnson, Andrew)
December 4, 2013 Filing 204 NOTICE to Terminate Service of Filings in Case by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC (Onsager, Christian)
December 2, 2013 Filing 203 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Adam L. Massaro on Behalf of Defendants Newforth Partners, LLC, Dhando Investments, Inc., and Robert Hoffer by Adam Lee Massaro on behalf of Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLCAttorney Adam Lee Massaro added to party Dhando Investments, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Lee Massaro added to party Robert Hoffer(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Lee Massaro added to party Newforth Partners, LLC(pty:dft) (Massaro, Adam)
December 2, 2013 Filing 202 REPLY to Response to #157 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Colby B. Springer In Support of "Dhando Defendants"' Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit J)(Wooll, James)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MINUTE ORDER granting #197 Defendant Robert Hoffers Unopposed Motion to Restrict Access Pursuant to Local Rule 7.2. The Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain under Restriction Level One the documents located at dockets # 191- 14, 192-1, 192-2, 192-3, and 192-4 until further order of the Court, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/2/2013.(ervsl, )
November 29, 2013 Filing 200 MOTION to Strike #192 Exhibits, #191 Exhibits,, For Failure to Authenticate, Failure to Product, and Failure to Comply with Rule 26(A)(2)(B) by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Springer, Colby)
November 25, 2013 Filing 199 MEMORANDUM regarding #197 MOTION for Leave to Restrict Document filed by Robert Hoffer. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/25/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
November 22, 2013 Filing 198 PROPOSED ORDER by Defendant Robert Hoffer. (Springer, Colby) (Modified on 11/25/2013 This is a Proposed Order and not a Motion)(ervsl, ).
November 22, 2013 Filing 197 MOTION for Leave to Restrict Document by Defendant Robert Hoffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Email Correspondence with Plaintiff Concerning Failure to Properly Seek Leave to Restrict))(Springer, Colby)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #194 Unopposed Motion to Seal Exhibits by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/22/13.(dkals, )
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MEMORANDUM regarding #194 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Seal ExhibitsUnopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #192 Exhibits, #191 Exhibits,, #193 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/21/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
November 21, 2013 Filing 194 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Seal Exhibits, Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #192 Exhibits, #191 Exhibits,, #193 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
November 20, 2013 Filing 193 RESPONSE to #157 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
November 20, 2013 Filing 192 Exhibits in Opposition #191 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Attachments: RESTRICTED #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20)(Gordon, Paul) (Modified on 11/21/2013 edited the title to Exhibits in Opposition)(ervsl, ). (Modified on 12/2/2013 Restricted exhibits pursuant to the #201 Minute Order)(ervsl, ).
November 20, 2013 Filing 191 Exhibits in Opposition #157 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13(RESTRICTED Exhibit 14, #14) Exhibit 15)(Gordon, Paul) (Modified on 11/21/2013 edited duplicate text)(ervsl, ). (Modified on 11/21/2013 edited the title of the text to Exhibits in Opposition)(ervsl, ). (Modified on 12/2/2013 Exhibit 14 RESTRICTED pursuant to the #201 Minute Order)(ervsl, ).
November 19, 2013 Filing 190 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on October 23, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pages: 1-25. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/21/2014. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MINUTE ORDER Status Conference reset for 12/19/2013 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/12/2013. (mehcd)
November 9, 2013 Filing 188 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of James K. Kreutz by Paul Gordon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gordon, Paul)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting #186 Plaintiffs and Defendants Sherwood Partners, LLC and Tim Coxs Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Tim Cox (an individual) and Sherwood Partners, LLC (a California Limited liability company) are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall pay his or its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/6/2013.(ervsl, )
November 6, 2013 Filing 186 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Party Sherwood Partners, LLC, and Tim Cox with Prejudice by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Johnson, Andrew)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MINUTE ORDER This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. Due to a conflict in the Courts calendar, the Status Conference currently set for November 14, 2013 is vacated and rescheduled. Status Conference RESET for 11/21/2013 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/6/2013. (ervsl, )
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #183 The Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Given the Court's prior notice to the parties that no further extension of the subject filing deadlines would be considered, the Parties' Joint Motion is GRANTED IN PART solely in an effort to coordinate with Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty's orders and settings in this case. Plaintiff's deadline to file its Response to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment is extended up to and including November 20, 2013. Defendants' deadline to file their Replies in support of their Motions for Summary Judgment is extended up to and including December 2, 2013. The Court will summarily deny any further motions seeking a further extension of the relevant filing deadlines. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/25/2013. Text Only Entry(wjmsec, )
October 25, 2013 Filing 183 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #157 First MOTION for Summary Judgment , #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
October 23, 2013 Filing 182 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 10/23/2013. Status Conference set for 11/14/2013 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Overruling #151 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. The Court concludes that the Magistrate Judges analysis was thorough and sound, and that there is no clear error on the face of the record. In accordance with the foregoing, the Plaintiffs Objection ECF No. #151 is OVERRULED, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/18/2013.(ervsl, )
October 17, 2013 Filing 180 RESPONSE to #169 MOTION for Protective Order (Motion for Sanctions #171 and #172 ) filed by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gordon, Paul)
October 17, 2013 Filing 179 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Agenda for October 23, 2013 Status Conference by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #173 Plaintiff's Motion to Reschedule Pretrial Conference. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty IS CONVERTED TO A STATUS CONFERENCE. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/16/2013. (mehcd)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MINUTE ORDER: In light of #176 Plaintiff's Notice of its Withdrawal of Motion for Protective Order, #169 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order is withdrawn. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/16/2013. (mehcd)
October 16, 2013 Filing 176 NOTICE re #171 Response to Motion, #169 MOTION for Protective Order , #172 Response to Motion, Withdrawal of #169 Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc. (Gordon, Paul)(Modified on 10/16/2013 to be refiled as a Motion pursuant to the Judge's Chambers) (ervsl, ).
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER. This matter is before Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motions for Summary Judgment. (ECF No. 166.) While the Court is sympathetic to Plaintiff's plight in this case, it has had sufficient time since July 2013 to explore the issue of the Court's subject matter jurisdiction in this case. Indeed, a deposition was said to take place with Monster Media on September 26, 2013; this was an appropriate time as to when the issue of real party of interest and jurisdiction could have been addressed. As such, the Court will only grant a limited extension as follows: (1) Plaintiff's Response to each of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 153, 157 ) are to be filed by no later than OCTOBER 28, 2013; (2) Defendants' Reply briefing is to be filed by no later than NOVEMBER 8, 2013. If the issue of subject matter jurisdiction has not been resolved among the Parties by October 28, 2013, the Court DIRECTS the Parties to address this issue in (1) and (2), respectively. The Court will afford the Parties an additional five pages to address the issue of subject matter jurisdiction in addition to the issues that have been raised in ECF Nos. 153 and 157. No FURTHER EXTENSIONS of the briefing schedule in regards to the subject motions for summary judgement will be granted. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/16/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmlc2, )
October 15, 2013 Filing 174 MEMORANDUM regarding #173 MOTION to Vacate Pretrial Conference filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/15/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
October 15, 2013 Filing 173 MOTION to Vacate Pretrial Conference by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
October 9, 2013 Filing 172 RESPONSE to #169 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F and F-2, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Johnson, Andrew)
October 1, 2013 Filing 171 RESPONSE to #169 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Wooll, James)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM regarding #169 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 09/24/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 24, 2013 Filing 169 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email)(Gordon, Paul)
September 18, 2013 Filing 168 RESPONSE to #166 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Johnson, Andrew)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on #166 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions for Summary Judgment #153 #157 . Defendants are DIRECTED to file a single Response to the Motion on or before September 19, 2013. No Reply will be permitted. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 09/17/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 16, 2013 Filing 166 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
September 6, 2013 Filing 165 RESPONSE to #151 Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision filed by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Johnson, Andrew)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Objection /Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision #151 pursuant to Rule 72(a). Should the Defendants determine a Response is necessary, said Response shall be filed on or before September 6, 2013. No Reply will be permitted. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 08/27/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE ORDER Plaintiffs Amended Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Appeal Sanction, docket #155 is granted. The Court will accept as filed the Plaintiffs Objections to Limited Sanction docket #151 filed August 23, 2013.In light of this order, Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Appeal Sanction [filed August 23, 2013; docket #152 is denied as moot, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/26/2013.(ervsl, )
August 26, 2013 Filing 162 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition upon Monster Vision, LLC d/b/a Monster Media on August 23, 2013, filed by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC (Wooll, James)
August 26, 2013 Filing 161 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition upon Monster Media on August 23, 2013, filed by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC (Wooll, James)
August 26, 2013 Filing 160 MEMORANDUM regarding #152 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal Sanction filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 08/26/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 26, 2013 Filing 159 MEMORANDUM regarding #155 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal Sanction filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 08/26/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 23, 2013 Filing 158 Proposed Order to ISO Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Springer, Colby) (Modified on 8/26/2013 Termed Motion as this is a Proposed Order)(ervsl, ).
August 23, 2013 Filing 157 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Springer, Colby)
August 23, 2013 Filing 156 DECLARATION of Colby B. Springer by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Springer, Colby)
August 23, 2013 Filing 155 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal Sanction by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
August 23, 2013 Filing 154 BRIEF in Support of #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Andrew)
August 23, 2013 Filing 153 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Johnson, Andrew)
August 23, 2013 Filing 152 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal Sanction by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
August 23, 2013 Filing 151 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re #144 Order,,,, by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Granting #145 Notice of Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.; the first claim for relief as it applies to Defendant Dhando; the third claim for relief as it applies to Defendant Dhando; the third claim for relief as it applies to the enterprise offering claims against Defendants Newforth and Hoffer; the third claim for relief as it applies to Defendant Cox; the fourth claim for relief as it applies to Defendants Newforth and Hoffer; the seventh claim for relief; the eighth claim for relief; the ninth claim for relief as it applies to Defendant Newforth; and, the tenth claim for relief as it applies to Defendant Newforth, by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/23/2013. (ervsl, )
August 22, 2013 Filing 149 NOTICE of Service of Subpoenas by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC (Springer, Colby)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #146 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time in which to Appeal Sanctions, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/19/2013. (mehcd)
August 19, 2013 Filing 147 MEMORANDUM regarding #146 MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal Sanctions filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 08/19/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 16, 2013 Filing 146 MOTION for Extension of Time to Appeal Sanctions by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
August 11, 2013 Filing 145 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Claims by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc. (Gordon, Paul)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Pursuant to this Courts order granting in part Defendants Motion to Compel and for Sanctions docket #129 , defense counsel has timely filed an affidavit setting forth a summary of his and his associates experience and a description of the services rendered, the amount of time spent, the hourly rate, and the total amount of attorneys fees claimed for Defendants preparation of the motion. Although provided the opportunity to do so, Plaintiff did not file any objections to the affidavit. The Court finds that Mr. Onsagers hourly rate ($305.00) and Mr. Johnsons hourly rate ($220.00) are reasonable and that the total time necessary (4.1 hours) to research and prepare an 8-page motion containing approximately 160 pages of attachments is appropriate. WHEREFORE, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff be sanctioned in the amount of $1,140.00, to be paid to counsel for the Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC as a reasonable sanction of attorneys fees. This amount shall be paid no later than August 30, 2013. Counsel for Plaintiff shall file a Notice of Compliance with Order re: Sanctions on or before September 6, 2013, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/6/2013. (ervsl, )
July 30, 2013 Filing 143 MINUTE ENTRY for RULE 16(c)(2)(E) Status Conference held before Judge William J. Martinez on July 30, 2013: ORDERED: Defendants' oral motion to extend discovery is GRANTED. Discovery shall be reopened for 60 days, up to and including September 30, 2013, for the purpose of taking the depositions of Monster Media and Mr. Jeffrey Storey. Hearing concluded. Court Reporter: Gwen Daniel. (wjmcd, )
July 29, 2013 Filing 142 Proposed Order by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul) (Modified on 7/30/2013 edited the title of the text to reflect that this is a Proposed Order)(ervsl, ).
July 29, 2013 Filing 141 SUPPLEMENTAL Response to Notices of Intent to Move for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc. (Gordon, Paul) (Modified on 7/30/2013 edited the title ofthe text to reflect that it is a Supplemental) (ervsl, ).
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER. This matter is before the Court on Defendants' Notices of Intent to Seek Summary Judgment. (ECF Nos. 104, 106.) The Court notes that it has found these filings helpful in terms of preparation for the Rule 16(c) Conference. In particular, the Court notes that Plaintiff's table, summarizing the claims, will be relied upon during the Conference. (ECF No. 127 at 2.) The Court also notes that Plaintiff has indicated that it will voluntarily dismiss several claims. To this end, and given the utility of Plaintiff's table, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to (1) provide a 'second' table, denoting which claims Plaintiff will voluntarily dismiss. Plaintiff should use the acronym 'VD' to denote such claims, and (2) file a draft proposed Order reflecting what claims are voluntarily dismissed as outlined in the second table. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file (1) and (2) by no later than 10 a.m., Tuesday, July 30, 2013. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/29/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmlc2, )
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #136 Sixth Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. Discovery due by 8/9/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 8/23/2013. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 10/23/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/23/2013. (mehcd)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM regarding #136 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Sherwood Partners, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/23/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 22, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE re #129 Order on Motion to Compel re Attorneys' Fees by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Declaration of Christian C. Onsager in support of Attorneys' fees, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration--Firm Bio, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration--CV of Christian C. Onsager)(Johnson, Andrew)
July 22, 2013 Filing 136 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Scheduling Order by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Produced Transcript, #2 Exhibit B--July 9 deposition excerpt, #3 Exhibit C--May 17 deposition excerpt, #4 Exhibit D--Gordon 7-15 email, #5 Exhibit D2--Gordon 7-15 email, #6 Exhibit E--Johnson 7-17 email, #7 Exhibit F--Gordon 7-17 email, #8 Exhibit G--Johnson 7-17 email, #9 Exhibit H--Gordon 7-17 email, #10 Exhibit I--Wendt email, #11 Exhibit J--Johnson 7-18 email, #12 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Johnson, Andrew)
July 19, 2013 Filing 135 NOTICE of Attorney's Retaining Lien by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc. (Wendt, Brett)
July 15, 2013 Filing 134 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service of Order #129 by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #131 The Fifth Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for a Limited Purpose Through August 9, 2013, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/11/2013.(ervsl, )
July 11, 2013 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM regarding #131 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for a Limited Purpose Through August 9, 2013 filed by Sherwood Partners, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/11/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 10, 2013 Filing 131 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for a Limited Purpose Through August 9, 2013 by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Johnson, Andrew)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #100 Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLCs Motion to Determine Privilege Pursuant to Protective Order Inspection, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/10/2013.(ervsl, )
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #98 Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLCs Motion to Compel (1) the Production of Documents; and (2) Responses to Interrogatories, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/10/2013.(ervsl, )
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar the Rule 16(c) Scheduling Conference set for July 19, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED and RESET to July 30, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom A801. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/09/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 3, 2013 Filing 127 NOTICE of Intent to Object to Summary Jugment by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc. (Gordon, Paul)
June 28, 2013 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to #98 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery filed by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Johnson, Andrew)
June 28, 2013 Filing 125 REPLY to Response to #100 MOTION for In Camera Inspection to Determine Privilege Pursuant to Protective Order filed by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Johnson, Andrew)
June 26, 2013 Filing 124 RESPONSE to #98 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery filed by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
June 26, 2013 Filing 123 RESPONSE to #100 MOTION for In Camera Inspection to Determine Privilege Pursuant to Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER. Due to a scheduling conflict in the Court's calendar, the Parties shall attend a Rule 16(c)(2)(E) Conference on Friday, July 19, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom A801. The previous Rule 16(c)(2)(E) Conference, set for July 11, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 06/28/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmlc2,)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #116 Plaintiffs Motion for Extensions of Time, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/24/2013.(ervsl, )
June 20, 2013 Filing 120 RESPONSE to #116 MOTION for Extension of Time to files Responses filed by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Springer, Colby)
June 20, 2013 Filing 119 RESPONSE to #116 MOTION for Extension of Time to files Responses filed by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Johnson, Andrew)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MINUTE ORDER re: #116 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file a response to the motion on or before 6/20/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/18/2013. (mehcd)
June 17, 2013 Filing 117 MEMORANDUM regarding #116 MOTION for Extension of Time to files Responses filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/17/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1, )
June 16, 2013 Filing 116 MOTION for Extension of Time to files Responses by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER granting #113 the Fourth Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for a Limited Purpose Through July 10, 2013 filed by Defendant Sherwood Partners. Discovery due by 7/10/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/7/2013. (mehcd)
June 7, 2013 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM regarding #113 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for a Limited Purpose Through July 10, 2013 filed by Sherwood Partners, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 06/07/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 6, 2013 Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for a Limited Purpose Through July 10, 2013 by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Johnson, Andrew)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #108 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate; Any Party desiring to file a Response to a Notice of Intent to File a Motion for Summary Judgment must do so no later than July 3, 2013; The Parties shall attend a Rule 16(c)(2)(E) Conference on July 11, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom A801, unless prior to that day the Court vacates such Conference; In order to accommodate the above schedule and procedures, the Court extends the dispositive motion deadline to July 26, 2013, before Judge William J. Martinez. by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/4/2013.(ervsl, )
June 4, 2013 Filing 111 RESPONSE to #108 MOTION to Vacate Hearing and for Extensions of Time filed by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Johnson, Andrew)
June 4, 2013 Filing 110 RESPONSE to #108 MOTION to Vacate Hearing and for Extensions of Time (Opposition to the Same) filed by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Springer, Colby)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER. This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Hearing and for Extensions of Time. (ECF No. 108.) The Court DIRECTS the relevant Defendant-entities to file a Response by no later than Tuesday, June 4, 2013 at 1:00 p.m. The Response shall not exceed two pages, exclusive of attorney signature blocks and certificate of service. No Reply will be permitted. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 06/04/13. Text Only Entry (wjmlc2, )
June 3, 2013 Filing 108 MOTION to Vacate Hearing and for Extensions of Time by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Gordon, Paul)
May 30, 2013 Filing 107 ANSWER to #55 Amended Complaint by Sherwood Partners, LLC.(Onsager, Christian)
May 28, 2013 Filing 106 NOTICE re #94 Order, Intent to Seek Summary Judgment by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC (Springer, Colby)
May 28, 2013 Filing 105 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement by Defendants Tim Cox, Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC, Sherwood Partners, LLC, Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Springer, Colby)
May 28, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE re #94 Order,,, Intent to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.)(Onsager, Christian)
May 28, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christian C. Onsager on behalf of Sherwood Partners, LLC (Onsager, Christian)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM regarding #100 MOTION for In Camera Inspection to Determine Privilege Pursuant to Protective Order filed by Sherwood Partners, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/28/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER granting #96 the Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Through June 6, 2013. Discovery due by 6/6/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/24/2013. (mehcd)
May 24, 2013 Filing 100 MOTION for In Camera Inspection to Determine Privilege Pursuant to Protective Order by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., #2 Exhibit B., #3 Exhibit C., #4 Exhibit D., #5 Exhibit E., #6 Exhibit F., #7 Exhibit G., #8 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Johnson, Andrew)
May 24, 2013 Filing 99 MEMORANDUM regarding #98 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery filed by Sherwood Partners, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/24/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 23, 2013 Filing 98 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Transcript, #2 Exhibit B Discovery to DAD, #3 Exhibit C C DAD RFP Responses, #4 Exhibit D DAD ROG Responses, #5 Exhibit E Apr 6 2009 Email, #6 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Johnson, Andrew)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM regarding #96 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Sherwood Partners, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/23/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 23, 2013 Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Modify Scheduling Order by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Johnson, Andrew)
May 20, 2013 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #93 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,, by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Johnson, Andrew)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The Parties must meet and confer, and file a Joint Status Report by the deadlines set forth above; 2. Any Notice of Intent to File a Motion for Summary Judgment, as set forth above, must be filed no later than May 28, 2013; 3. Any Party desiring to file a Response to a Notice of Intent to File a Motion for Summary Judgment, as set forth above, must do so no later than June 3, 2013; 4. The Parties shall attend a Rule 16(c) (2)(E) Conference on June 7, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom A801, unless prior to that day the Court vacates such Conference in the manner set forth above; and 5. In order to accommodate the above schedule and procedures, the Court extends the dispositive motion deadline to June 24, 2013. By Judge William J. Martinez on 05/17/13. (alvsl)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #60 Defendants Sherwood Partners, LLC and Tim Cox (Sherwood or Defendants) Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.12(b)(6); Defendants Motion to Dismiss Claim II (Breach of Contract against Sherwood) is DENIED with respect to the NDA and GRANTED with respect to the LOI and the Enterprise Offering WITH PREJUDICE; Defendants Motion to Dismiss Claim III (Breach of the Implied Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing) is DENIED with respect to the NDA and GRANTED with respect to the LOI and the Enterprise Offering WITH PREJUDICE; Defendants Motion to Dismiss Claim V as to Defendant Sherwood and Defendant Cox (Deceit based on FraudFalse Representation) is GRANTED WITH PREJUDICE; Defendants Motion to Dismiss Claim VI (Deceit based on FraudNon-disclosure or Concealment) is GRANTED WITH PREJUDICE; Counsel for Defendants Sherwood and Cox are DIRECTED to have a copy of this Order served upon the General Counsel for Intellectual Ventures Holdings 67 LLC, and are further DIRECTED to file a Certificate of Service certifying said service on or before May 20, 2013, by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/16/2013.(ervsl, )
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER granting #88 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Eight-Day Extension of Time. Discovery due by 5/23/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/8/2013. (mehcd)
May 8, 2013 Filing 89 MEMORANDUM regarding #88 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to May 23, 2013 to Complete Depositions filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/08/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/7/2013. (mehcd)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER granting #86 the Stipulated Motion for Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/7/2013. (mehcd)
May 7, 2013 Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to May 23, 2013 to Complete Depositions by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Notice of Depositions, #2 Exhibit Amended Notice of Depositions)(Gordon, Paul)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM regarding #86 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Sherwood Partners, LLC, Tim Cox. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/06/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 6, 2013 Filing 86 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Johnson, Andrew)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #83 the "Joint Motion for Protective Order," by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/2/2013. (mehcd)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM regarding #83 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Sherwood Partners, LLC, Tim Cox. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/01/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 1, 2013 Filing 83 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Johnson, Andrew)
April 26, 2013 Filing 82 NOTICE of Depositions of Sherwood Defendants by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc. (Gordon, Paul)
April 26, 2013 Filing 81 NOTICE of Depositions of Newforth Defendants by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc. (Gordon, Paul)
April 26, 2013 Filing 80 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Gordon on behalf of Digital Advertising Displays, Inc. (Gordon, Paul)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER granting #77 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff. Attorney David Edward Kay terminated, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/25/2013.(ervsl, )
April 24, 2013 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM regarding #77 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 04/24/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 24, 2013 Filing 77 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kay, David)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER granting #74 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff. Attorney Brett M. Wendt terminated, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/22/2013.(ervsl, )
April 22, 2013 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM regarding #74 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 04/22/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 22, 2013 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wendt, Brett)
April 12, 2013 Filing 73 REPLY to Response to #28 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #60 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Johnson, Andrew)
March 29, 2013 Filing 72 BRIEF in Opposition to #60 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Kay, David)
March 26, 2013 Filing 71 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of David E. Kay by David Edward Kay on behalf of Digital Advertising Displays, Inc. (Kay, David)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER granting #68 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file a response to the pending partial motion to dismiss on or before 3/29/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/21/2013. (mehcd)
March 21, 2013 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM regarding #68 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #60 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/21/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1, )
March 21, 2013 Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #60 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wendt, Brett)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER Plaintiffs Second Motion to Amend/Modify Scheduling Order filed March 12, 2013; docket #63 is granted in part and denied in part. Initial expert designation: March 28, 2013; Rebuttal expert designation April 29, 2013; Discovery due by 5/15/2013; Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2013; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty; The parties shall submit their proposed pretrial order, pursuant to District of Colorado Electronic Case Filing (ECF) Procedures V.L. no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/14/2013.(ervsl, )
March 13, 2013 Filing 66 Exhibits in Support of #63 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #39 Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wendt, Brett)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM regarding #63 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #39 Scheduling Order filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/13/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 13, 2013 Filing 64 BRIEF in Opposition to #63 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #39 Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Springer, Colby)
March 12, 2013 Filing 63 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #39 Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Wendt, Brett)
February 27, 2013 Filing 62 ANSWER to #55 Amended Complaint by Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC.(Springer, Colby)
February 27, 2013 Filing 61 BRIEF in Support of #60 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Letter of Intent, #2 Exhibit 2 Non-Disclosure Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3-Enterprise Offering)(Johnson, Andrew)
February 27, 2013 Filing 60 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Partial Motion to Dismiss)(Johnson, Andrew)
February 20, 2013 Filing 59 STIPULATION re #55 Amended Complaint by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Springer, Colby)
February 20, 2013 Filing 58 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint (Amended Complaint) by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC, Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. All Defendants. (Johnson, Andrew)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with D.C. Colo. LCivR 7.1A and this Courts February 4, 2013 minute order #54 Plaintiffs Amended Motion to Amend/Modify Scheduling Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/11/2013.(ervsl, )
February 8, 2013 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM regarding #54 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 02/08/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
February 6, 2013 Filing 55 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc..(Wendt, Brett)
February 5, 2013 Filing 54 AMENDED MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #39 Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Wendt, Brett) (Modified on 2/8/2013 edited the title of the texx to reflect the title of the document filed)(ervsl, ).
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER re: #51 Plaintiffs Motion to Amend/Modify Scheduling Order filed February 1, 2013; docket #51 is denied without prejudice for failure to comply with D.C. Colo. LCivR 6.1D, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/4/2013.(ervsl, )
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM regarding #51 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #39 Scheduling Order filed by Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 02/01/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
February 1, 2013 Filing 51 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #39 Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Wendt, Brett)
January 31, 2013 Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint by Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC.(Springer, Colby)
January 31, 2013 Filing 49 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Colby B. Springer on behalf of Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC (Springer, Colby)
January 21, 2013 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #47 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Wooll, James)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting part and Denying in part #21 Defendants Motions to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); Granting in part and Denying in part #28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/17/2013.(ervsl, )
January 10, 2013 Filing 46 STATEMENT re #21 MOTION to Dismiss , 43 Order, #28 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Onsager, Christian)
January 10, 2013 Filing 45 RESPONSE to 43 Order, by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wooll, James)
January 10, 2013 Filing 44 STATEMENT of Facts by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Entity Schematic)(Wendt, Brett)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 12(b)(6) #21 #28 . Defendants are five in total. They are allegedly tied together through a range of oral, confidential and written agreements. Factually, the inter-relatedness between Defendants and a bankrupt entity as to the disputed Intellectual Property Assets (IP Assets) is complex. This is only heightened by the alleged relationship(s) between the Defendant entities and Plaintiff. Given this state of affairs, each of the parties are DIRECTED to file, no later than 9:00 a.m on Thursday, January 10, 2013: (a) a contemporaneous Statement of Facts addressing each of the above bankrupt, Defendant and Plaintiff entitiesincluding a detailed description of the alleged relationships between and among the entities as to the IP Assets. This Statement shall not exceed 3 pages, exclusive of attorney signature blocks and certificate of service, and (b) a contemporaneous schematic visualizing the relationship between the entities and the IP Assets as addressed in (a). The Court notes that it found a similar schematic to be helpful, in terms of its size and content, in Civil Action 12-cv-3157 (albeit in a different context.) (See ECF No. 24, Exh. 2.) The Court further notes that parties filings in (a) and (b) may vary to reflect the parties' positions, but 'common terms' in each filing would be useful for disposition of this matter. No responsive briefs or statements shall be permitted. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 01/08/2013. Text Only Entry (wjmlc2, )
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER granting #40 Defendants Partially Unopposed Joint Motion to Vacate Early Neutral Evaluation Dates and Suspend Early Neutral Evaluation Process, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/30/2012.(ervsl, )
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM regarding #40 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #39 Scheduling Order filed by Sherwood Partners, LLC, Newforth Partners, LLC, Tim Cox, Robert Hoffer, Dhando Investments, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 08/30/2012. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 29, 2012 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #39 Scheduling Order by Defendants Tim Cox, Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wooll, James)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/31/2012. (mehcd)
May 31, 2012 Filing 38 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 5/31/2012. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 6/8/2012. Joinder of Parties/Amendment of Pleadings due by 7/15/2012. Discovery due by 3/15/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2013. Initial expert disclosures due by 1/28/2013. Rebuttal expert disclosures due by 2/28/2013. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference set for 9/18/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (FTR: C. Coomes -- Courtroom A-501) (mehcd)
May 29, 2012 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to #28 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Johnson, Andrew)
May 29, 2012 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Wooll, James)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER Scheduling Conference RESET for 5/31/2012 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/24/2012. (mehcd)
May 23, 2012 Filing 34 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Wendt, Brett)
May 10, 2012 Filing 33 RESPONSE to #28 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sherwood Partners, LLC and Tim Cox filed by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Wendt, Brett)
May 10, 2012 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dhando, Hoffer and Newforth filed by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Wendt, Brett)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Newforth Partners, LLC, and Robert Hoffer's Motion to Dismiss #21 . Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED for good cause shown. Plaintiff has up to and including May 10, 2012 to file its Response to said Motion to Dismiss. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 04/27/2012. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 27, 2012 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc.. (Wendt, Brett)
April 16, 2012 Filing 29 BRIEF in Support of #28 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Johnson, Andrew)
April 16, 2012 Filing 28 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Intent, #2 Proposed Document)(Johnson, Andrew)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CORRECTED ORDER striking #24 Defendants Tim Cox and Sherwood Partners, LLCs' Amended Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and #25 Brief in Support of the Amended Motion to Dismiss. The Defendants' Motion and Brief are STRICKEN for failure to comply with this Court's Revised Practice Standard III.D.I. This Court's prior Order 23 striking the Defendants' original Motion to Dismiss did so specifically as a result of Defendants' failure to comply with WJM Revised Practice Standard III.D.1. The Defendants' Amended Motion provides a statement with regards to alleged compliance with WJM Revised Practice Standard III.D.3. Adding this statement of compliance with a different Practice Standard did nothing to cure the prior defect. Defendants Tim Cox and Sherwood Partners, LLC are on NOTICE that submission of a third Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) which fails to comply meaningfully with WJM Revised Practice Standard III.D.1 may result in the denial of such third motion with prejudice. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 04/11/2012. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER striking #24 Defendants Tim Cox and Sherwood Partners, LLCs' Amended Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and #25 Brief in Support of the Amended Motion to Dismiss. The Defendants' Motion and Brief are STRICKEN for failure to comply with this Court's Revised Practice Standard III.D.I. This Court's prior Order 23 striking the Defendants' original Motion to Dismiss did so specifically as a result of Defendants' failure to comply with WJM Revised Practice Standard III.D.1. The Defendants' Amended Motion provides a statement with regards to alleged compliance with WJM Revised Practice Standard III.D.3. Adding this statement of compliance with a different Practice Standard did nothing to cure the prior defect. Defendants Tim Cox and Sherwood Partners, LLC are on NOTICE that submission of a third Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) which fails to comply meaningfully with WJM Revised Practice Standard III.D.1 may result in a dismissal of the action. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 04/10/2012. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 9, 2012 Filing 25 STRICKEN BRIEF in Support of #24 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Johnson, Andrew) (Modified on 4/11/2012 Stricken pursuant to the 26 Order)(ervsl, ).
April 9, 2012 Filing 24 STRICKEN Amended MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Johnson, Andrew) (Modified on 4/11/2012 Stricken pursuant to the 26 Order)(ervsl, ).
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER striking #20 Defendants Tim Cox and Sherwood Partners, LLCs' Partial Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6). Defendants' Motion is STRICKEN for failure to comply with WJM Revised Practice Standard III.D.1, which requires counsel to confer prior to filing a Rule 12(b)(6) motion to discuss whether the alleged deficiency can be cured by amendment and to exercise their best efforts to stipulate to such amendment. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is STRICKEN without prejudice to refiling because it contains no statement with respect to whether such a conferral occurred in this case. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 04/09/2012. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 6, 2012 Filing 22 BRIEF in Support of #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Wooll, James)
April 6, 2012 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wooll, James)
April 6, 2012 Filing 20 STRICKEN Partial MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Andrew) (Modified on 4/9/2012 Stricken pursuant to the 23 Order)(ervsl, ).
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2012 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/3/2012. (mehcd)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 04/02/2012. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Discharging 11 Order to Show Cause by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/30/2012. (ervsl, )
March 30, 2012 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Wooll, James)
March 28, 2012 Filing 15 RESPONSE to 11 Order,,, by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Wooll, James)
March 28, 2012 Filing 14 RESPONSE to 10 Order,,, List of All Members and Officers of Sherwood Partners, LLC by Defendant Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Andrew)
March 28, 2012 Filing 13 JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Andrew)
March 28, 2012 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Court Order dated March 21, 2012, Document No. 10, by Defendant Newforth Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Disclosure of Officers and Members of Defendant Newforth Partners, LLC)(Wooll, James)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Defendants Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC, and Dhando Investments, Inc.'s Notice of Removal. (ECF No. 1.) The Court ORDERS those three Defendants to SHOW CAUSE, on or before March 28, 2012, why this action should not be remanded back to state court based on those three Defendants' apparent failure to have all defendants in the state court action join in or consent to the three Defendants' Notice of Removal. See 28 U.S.C. 1446(2)(A) ("[A]ll defendants who have been properly joined and served must join in or consent to the removal of the action."); Archuleta v. Lacuesta, 131 F.3d 1359, 1370 (10th Cir. 1997) ("Federal removal jurisdiction is statutory in nature and is to be strictly construed. Doubtful cases must be resolved in favor of remand."). SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/23/2012. Text Only Entry (wjmlc2, )
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Defendants Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC, and Dhando Investments, Inc.s' #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants Sherwood Partners, LLC and Newforth Partners, LLC are DIRECTED to file, on or before March 28, 2012, a listing of all officers and members of each such Defendant, which list shall be verified by affidavit or declaration from someone with personal knowledge of same. These Defendants are also DIRECTED to file a verified listing of the domicile and state citizenship of all officers and members of Sherwood Partners, LLC and Newforth Partners, LLC. If a partnership is itself a member of either Defendant LLC, then the Defendant is DIRECTED to provide a verified listing of the domicile and state citizenship of all general, limited and special partners of any such partnership. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/21/2012. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 20, 2012 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Tim Cox, Sherwood Partners, LLC. Tim Cox answer due 4/6/2012; Sherwood Partners, LLC answer due 4/6/2012. (Johnson, Andrew)
March 20, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION and Stipulation for Extension by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC (Wooll, James)
March 20, 2012 Filing 7 Exhibits in Support Notice of Removal - Register of Actions in State Case by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Wooll, James)
March 20, 2012 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Wooll, James)
March 20, 2012 Filing 5 Exhibits in Support of #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Defendants Dhando Investments, Inc., Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit State Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Delay Reduction Order, #4 Exhibit Summons - Sherwood Partners, #5 Exhibit Summons - Tim Cox, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Service - Tim Cox, #7 Exhibit Summons - Robert Hoffer)(Wooll, James)
March 19, 2012 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (sphil, )
March 19, 2012 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service)(sphil, )
March 16, 2012 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service on Sherwood Partners, filed by Plaintiff Digital Advertising Displays, Inc. (sphil, )
March 16, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC, Dhando Investments, Inc. from District Court, City and County of Denver, Colorado, Case Number 2012CV478. (Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 1082-2749051), filed by Robert Hoffer, Newforth Partners, LLC, Dhando Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 State District Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Delay Reduction Order, #4 Summons Sherwood Partners, LLC, #5 Affidavit of Service for Sherwood Partners, LLC, #6 Summons Tim Cox, #7 Affidavit of Service for Tim Cox, #8 Summons Newforth Partners, LLC, #9 Affidavit of Service for Newforth Partners, LLC, #10 Summons Dhando Investments, Inc., #11 Affidavit of service for Dhando Investments, Inc., #12 Summons Robert Hoffer, #13 Affidavit of Service for Robert Hoffer, #14 Plaintiff's Initial C.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) Disclosures, #15 Plaintiff's Initial C.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) Disclosures-Privilege Log, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Wooll, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digital Advertising Displays, Inc. v. Newforth Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Advertising Displays Inc
Represented By: John David Halepaska
Represented By: Stephen F. McWhirter
Represented By: Brett M. Wendt
Represented By: David Edward Kay
Represented By: Peter R. Bornstein
Represented By: James K. Kreutz
Represented By: Eric Bernard Limegrover
Represented By: Paul Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newforth Partners, LLC
Represented By: Colby B. Springer
Represented By: James Lewis Wooll
Represented By: Adam Lee Massaro
Represented By: Brent Rollow Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwood Partners, LLC
Represented By: Andrew David Johnson
Represented By: James Lewis Wooll
Represented By: Christian C. Onsager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Cox
Represented By: Andrew David Johnson
Represented By: James Lewis Wooll
Represented By: Christian C. Onsager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hoffer
Represented By: Colby B. Springer
Represented By: Hannah Theresa Yang
Represented By: James Lewis Wooll
Represented By: Adam Lee Massaro
Represented By: Brent Rollow Owen
Represented By: Quynh My Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dhando Investments Inc
Represented By: Colby B. Springer
Represented By: Hannah Theresa Yang
Represented By: James Lewis Wooll
Represented By: Adam Lee Massaro
Represented By: Brent Rollow Owen
Represented By: Quynh My Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?