Aiello v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Edna M. Aiello
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv00690
Filed: March 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Gilpin
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Unopposed Motion for Attorney's Fees under 42 U.S.C. §406(b) and pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(b)(6). Plaintiff's counsel, Ann J. Atkinson, is awarded fees in the amount of $19,635.50. By Judge John L. Kane on 6/6/13.(mnfsl, )
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Attorney Fees, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/14/12.(sgrim)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Remand. The Court directs the clerk to enter a judgment, by Judge John L. Kane on 8/9/12.(sgrim)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiff's Brief due by 7/11/2012. SS Defendant's Brief due by 8/13/2012. SS Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 8/27/2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 6/12/12. (lygsl, )
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/21/12.(gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aiello v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna M. Aiello
Represented By: Ann J. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?