Lovett v. Colorado State Penitentiary et al
Petitioner: Shawn Lovett
Respondent: Colorado State Penitentiary and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2012cv00706
Filed: March 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The, Colorado State Penitentiary against Shawn Lovett re: 23 Order, by Edward P. Butler, Deputy Clerk on 11/5/2012. (ervsl, )
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Claims One and 3(b) are dismissed with prejudice as procedurally defaulted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Claim 3(a) is dismissed with prejudice because it is not cognizable in a federal habeas proceeding. It is FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days Respondents are directed to file an answer in compliance with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases that fully addresses the merits of exhausted Claim Two. It is FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of the filing of the answer Applicant may file a reply, if he desires, by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/31/2012. (ervsl, )
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/19/12. (nmmsl, )
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER To File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/22/12. (nmmsl, )
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/22/12. (lsw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovett v. Colorado State Penitentiary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shawn Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colorado State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?