Wylie v. OMNI Hotels Management Corporation
Plaintiff: M J Wylie
Defendant: OMNI Hotels Management Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012cv00725
Filed: March 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Broomfield
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 63 Jury Trial - Completed. By Clerk on 2/1/13. (mnfsl, )
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. A four-day jury trial is set for January 28, 2013 at 8:00 a.m. in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference is set for January 11, 2013 at 2:30 p.m. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/24/25. (pabsec)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 5/3/2012. Discovery due by 6/29/2012. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/24/2012 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Crai g B. Shaffer. The court shall allow the plaintiff's 18 MOTION for Order to Bind Defendant to CRCP 30(b)(6) Testimony and Limit the Testimony of CRCP 30(b)(6) Representative David Jurcak to be WITHDRAWN without prejudice. (FTR: Robin Mason) (cbscd, )
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 5/3/2012 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/30/12. Text Only Entry (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wylie v. OMNI Hotels Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M J Wylie
Represented By: William P. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMNI Hotels Management Corporation
Represented By: Benton Jordan Barton
Represented By: Leslie Anne Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?