Taddeo v. Bank of America
Plaintiff: Vincenzo Taddeo
Defendant: Bank of America
Case Number: 1:2012cv00798
Filed: March 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/31/12. (msksec, )
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/25/2012. (mjwcd)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/20/2012. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taddeo v. Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincenzo Taddeo
Represented By: Jill Gookin
Represented By: Matthew R. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?