First Mercury Insurance Company, v. Stephenson Construction Inc.
Plaintiff: First Mercury Insurance Company
Defendant: Stephenson Construction Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00862
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 20 in favor of First Mercury Insurance Company against Stephenson Construction Inc. as to Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint. Count II is dismissed with prejudice. By Edward P. Butler, Deputy Clerk on 10/12/12. (alvsl)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. When the remaining claims have been disposed of, the Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff on Count I of its Complaint, by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/19/12.(lygsl, )
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/29/2012. (kmtcd)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/5/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/16/2012. (kmtcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Mercury Insurance Company, v. Stephenson Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael R. Gregg
Represented By: Rachel H. Krayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephenson Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?