Niemi et al v. Burgess et al
Plaintiff: John Niemi, Robert Naegele, III and Jesper Parnevik
Defendant: Michael Frank Burgess, Erwin Lasshofer, Innovatis GMBH, Innovatis Immobilien GMBH, Innovatis Asset Management SA, Lexington Capital & Property Investments, LLC and Barry Funt
Case Number: 1:2012cv00869
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 276 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 252 Clerk's Judgment, approved by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/3/2014. (tscha, )
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER: Plaintiffs' claims other than the two claims that are the subject of this court's Final Judgment and the pending appeal (Counts Five and Twelve) are dismissed with prejudice. 255 Motion for Order is DENIED; 257 Motion to Quash is GRANTED; 267 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as MOOT; 270 Cross-Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice Upon Conditions is DENIED. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/29/14.(jdyne, )
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 252 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Jesper Parnevik, John Niemi, Robert Naegele, III against Credit Suisse AG, Lexington Capital & Property Investments, LLC, Barry Funt, Michael Frank Burgess re: 251 Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/23/2013. (ervsl, )
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER for Warrant for the arrest of Defendant Erwin Lasshofer, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 06/24/13. (alvsl)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Status Conference held on 5/9/2013. ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Subpoenas Served by the Lasshofer Defendants 200 is DENIED. ORDERED: The hearing currently set on June 7, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. is now set for the entire day on pending motions. Conference concluded. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (wjmcd, )
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Rescheduling Trial and Trial Preparation Conference. Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/17/2013 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. A Two-Week Jury Trial set for 8/5/2013 09:00 AM, 8/6/2013 09:00 AM, 8/7/2013 09 :00 AM, 8/8/2013 09:00 AM, 8/9/2013 09:00 AM, 8/12/2013 09:00 AM, 8/13/2013 09:00 AM, 8/14/2013 09:00 AM, 8/15/2013 09:00 AM, and 8/16/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/02/13. (alvsl)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MINUTE ENTRY for Show Cause Hearing held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on March 26, 2013: ORDERED: The Court will not accept a motion or brief longer than 20 pages, nor more than ten exhibits, for the rest of this case from any of the parties at any time. ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt and Sanctions 83 is GRANTED. The defendants are found to be in contempt of the Court's Order of June 1, 2012. The Lasshofer Defendants have two weeks, through April 9, 2013, to put t he money in an escrow account; and, if they do not, starting on April 10, 2013, the Court will fine the Lasshofer Defendants, including Mr. Lasshofer, personally, $10,000 a day until they comply. ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Jud gment Against the Lasshofer Defendants and Credit Suisse AG 151 IS DENIED. ORDERED: Motion by Mr. Lasshofer and the Innovatis Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3) Regarding Lack of Standing and Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Request to Dismiss Case 171 is DENIED. THE COURT FINDS IT HAS SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Credit Suisse AG to Participate in Discovery 175 is GRANTED. The parties shall file a report within 30 days as to whe ther or not Credit Suisse is complying. ORDERED: The Submission of Mr. Lasshofer and the Innovatis Defendants in Connection with Show Cause Hearing and in Opposition to Finding of Contempt 176 is DENIED AS MOOT. A two-week Jury Trial is set for 3/31/2014 at 09:00 a.m. in Courtroom A902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. A Final Trial Preparation Conference is set for one-half day on 3/14/2014 at 01:00 p.m. in Courtroom A902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (wjmcd, )
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/8/2013. It was ORDERED: Denying 52 Motion for Entry of Default; Finding as moot 57 Motion to Appoint Special Master; Denying 67 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdict ion; Granting 68 Motion for Hearing/Conference; Granting 82 Motion to Compel; Finding as moot 101 Motion to Compel; Granting 152 Motion to Compel; he response shall be filed no later than March 22, 2013; Granting 153 Motion to Compel; Granting 159 Motion for Discovery. Show Cause Hearing regarding 83 set for 3/26/2013 9:00 AM in Courtroom A902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Defendants to respond to the complaint no later than March 22, 2013. The Court will hold the defendant s in default if no response is filed by that date. Defendants to file a response/surreply to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment Against the Lasshofer Defendants and Credit Suisse AG # 151 no later than March 22, 2013. This motion will be held in abeyance and addressed at the March 26, 2013 hearing. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (lag)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/30/2012. Granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion for TRO. Court Reporter: Gwen Daniel. (lag)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER. The Emergency Motion of the Innovatis Defendants to Suspend Courts June 1, 2012, Preliminary Injunction Order Pending Appeal 53 is DENIED. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/20/2012.(sahsl, )
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 33 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/1/2012.(sahsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niemi et al v. Burgess et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Niemi
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Schrero
Represented By: Robert Nolen Miller
Represented By: Christopher William Madel
Represented By: Stephanie Erin Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Naegele, III
Represented By: Christopher William Madel
Represented By: Stephanie Erin Dunn
Represented By: Robert Nolen Miller
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Schrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesper Parnevik
Represented By: Stephanie Erin Dunn
Represented By: Christopher William Madel
Represented By: Robert Nolen Miller
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Schrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Frank Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erwin Lasshofer
Represented By: Kevin D. Evans
Represented By: Jaasi Jared Munanka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovatis GMBH
Represented By: Kevin D. Evans
Represented By: Jaasi Jared Munanka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovatis Immobilien GMBH
Represented By: Kevin D. Evans
Represented By: Jaasi Jared Munanka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovatis Asset Management SA
Represented By: Kevin D. Evans
Represented By: Jaasi Jared Munanka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Capital & Property Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Funt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?