Echenique v. Google Inc., et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Ivette T. Echenique
Defendant: You tube and Google Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00883
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2012 Filing 14 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 13 ORDER of Dismissal on 7/5/12. (lygsl, )
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the action is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/5/12. (lygsl, )
June 14, 2012 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against You tube and Google Inc., filed by Ivette T. Echenique.(skssl, )
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER DENIED as moot 10 Motion for Extension, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/21/2012.(skssl, )
May 18, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension, by Plaintiff Ivette T. Echenique. (skssl, )
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/17/2012.(skssl, )
May 16, 2012 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension, by Plaintiff Ivette T. Echenique. (skssl, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to show cause why this action should not be dismissed as repetitive of Case No. 12-cv-00880-BNB, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/26/2012. (skssl, )
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/25/2012.(skssl, )
April 24, 2012 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT/LAST PAGE to 3 MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Ivette T. Echenique. (nmmsl, )
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plantiff to Cure Deficiency by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/05/2012. (skssl, )
April 4, 2012 Filing 3 MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Ivette T. Echenique. (dbera, )
April 4, 2012 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
April 4, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G-mail, Google, You tube, filed by Ivette T. Echenique.(dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Echenique v. Google Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivette T. Echenique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: You tube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?