Muragara, v. MacKenzie Place, The-Colorado Springs, Employer.,
Plaintiff: Jeckonias N. Muragara
Defendant: Mackenzie Place, The-Colorado Springs, Employer
Case Number: 1:2012cv00891
Filed: April 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Mackenzie's Motion for Summary Judgment 24 is GRANTED IN PART, insofar as Mackenzie is entitled to summary judgment on Mr. Muragara's claims of ho stile environment harassment and disparate treatment, and DENIED IN PART, insofar as Mr. Muragara's retaliation claim will proceed to trial. The parties shall begin preparation of a joint proposed Pretrial Order as directed by the Trial Preparation Order (#20) and shall jointly contact chambers to schedule a Pretrial Conference within 14 days. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/28/14.(msksec, )
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: The First Motion for Sanctions [Doc. # 28 ] and the Second Motion for Sanctions [Doc. # 31 ] are STRICKEN. The Motion to Strike [Doc. # 29 ] is GRANTED insofar as it requests that the First Motion for Sanctions be stricken and DENIED to the ex tent it seeks sanctions against the plaintiff. The plaintiff must cease filing papers related to offers of settlement; frivolous papers; and papers containing immaterial and impertinent statements and ad hominem attacks against defense counsel, and h is failure to comply with this order will result in sanctions, including dismissal of this case with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall cause the plaintiffs electronic filing privileges to be terminated. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/14/2013. (klyon, )
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/1/12. (msksec, )
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Scheduling Conference re-set for 8/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Parties to conventionally file a proposed Second Supplemental Scheduling Order on or before 8/2/12 with initials on each page and signature on final page. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/9/12. (bnbcd, )
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Supplemental Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/08/2012. (wjcsl, )
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/3/12. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muragara, v. MacKenzie Place, The-Colorado Springs, Employer.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackenzie Place, The-Colorado Springs, Employer
Represented By: Joanna Monk Thies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeckonias N. Muragara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?