Dawson v. Audet et al
Plaintiff: James Ralph Dawson, Jr.
Defendant: Paul Audet, Susan Audet, Donald Brightwell, Dino Williams, Angel Medina, Steven Owens and Anthony DeCesaro
Case Number: 1:2012cv00901
Filed: April 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER GRANTING MOTION CHALLENGING TAXATION OF COSTS: The Court GRANTS Mr. Dawson's motion 157 and vacates that portion of the Clerk's taxation of costs relating to Ms. Butler. Costs are taxed in favor of Defendants in the amount of $509.41, and the Judgment is deemed amended to reflect that award. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/8/16.(msksec, )
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 and Fed. R. App. 24, 153 , and Motion for Free Transcript for Appeal, 152 , are denied re: 146 Notice of Appeal by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 04/15/15.(jhawk, )
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MINUTE ENTRY for Final Pretrial Conference held before Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/13/2014. 101 Motion to Appoint Counsel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; 102 Motion for Order is DENIED; 103 Motion for Order is DENIED as moot; 108 Motion to Clarify is GRANTED. Jury Trial(4 days) set for 3/9/2015 -3/12/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Other matters addressed, including deadlines, if any,are set forth in the Minutes. Court Reporter: Terri Lindblom. (pglov)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS SUMMARY JUDGMENT: For the foregoing reasons (1) Mr. Dawson's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 84 is DENIED. (2) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 86 is G RANTED in part, as to the claims against Mr. Audet and Mr. Medina, and DENIED in part, as to the claim against Mr. Brightwell. Judgment against those Defendants shall enter at the conclusion of proceedings in this action. (3) Only the & #167; 1983 claim against Mr. Brightwell will proceed. The caption of the case is AMENDED to omit all Defendants except Mr. Brightwell. Consistent with Mr. Dawson's express request in his Complaint (#1), a bench trial will be cond ucted. (4) The parties shall promptly begin preparation of a Proposed Pretrial Order consistent with the January 31, 2013 Trial Preparation Order (#50) and shall make arrangements to jointly contact chambers to schedule a Pretrial Conference. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/30/14.(msksec, )
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 OPINION AND ORDER denying 84 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and granting in part and denying in part 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56, by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/30/14. The caption of the case is amended to omit all Defendants except Mr. Brightwell. (dkals, )
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying as moot 70 Motion to Compel; denying 73 Motion to Compel. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/25/13.(bnbcd, )
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: A letter addressed to the Clerk of the Court [Doc. # 57 ]; a letter addressed to me [Doc. # 58 ]; Plaintiff's Rule 26(a) Disclosures [Doc. # 63 ]; Plaintiff's Answer to Defendants' Interrogatories [Doc. # 65 ]; Plaintiff's Answer to Defendants' Request for Production of Documents Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 34 [Doc. # 66 ]; Plaintiff's Answer to Defendants' Request for Admissions [Doc. # 67 ]; and a letter addressed to the Clerk of the Court [Doc. # 68 ] are STRICKEN. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/29/2013. (klyon, )
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 36 Motion to Strike; denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/12/12.(bnbcd, )
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: 18 Motion to Strike is DENIED. 20 Letter and 21 Letter are both STRICKEN. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/10/12.(bnbcd, )
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: denying without prejudice 11 Motion for leave to supplement Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/18/12.(bnbcd, )
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/20/2012. (skssl, )
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/06/12. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson v. Audet et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ralph Dawson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Audet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Audet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Brightwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dino Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony DeCesaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?