Ragsdell v. Regional Housing Alliance of La Plata County et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Jason Ragsdell
Defendant: La Plata Homes Fund, Inc., Jennifer Lopez and Regional Housing Alliance of La Plata County
Case Number: 1:2012cv00967
Filed: April 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: La Plata
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 OPINION AND ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant's 96 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Equal Protection Claim is DENIED. The parties are ORDERED to jointly call chambers at 303-844-6118 on or before Friday, March 4, 2016 in order to set a pre-trial conference in this case, by Judge John L. Kane on 2/24/2016.(agarc, )
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 JUDGMENT in favor of Jennifer Lopez against Kenneth Jason Ragsdell on Plaintiff's first claim of relief re: 80 Order, by Clerk on 02/20/2015. (athom, )
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 34 and Granting 35 by Judge John L. Kane on 03/12/14.(jhawk, )
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Stipulation and Protective Order, by Judge John L. Kane on 12/12/12. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ragsdell v. Regional Housing Alliance of La Plata County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Jason Ragsdell
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer
Represented By: Sarah Marie Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Plata Homes Fund, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Housing Alliance of La Plata County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?