Stout, v. Gyrodata, Inc.
Plaintiff: Terry A. Stout
Defendant: Gyrodata, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00972
Filed: April 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 66 Motion for Attorney Fees. Gyrodata is owed $65,026.00 in attorneys' fees, which shall be paid to Gyrodata by Mr. Stout and his counsel on or before close of business on January 31, 2015. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/18/2014.(tscha, )
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant on all claims, and the trial preparation conference set for September 16, 2013 and the trial set for September 30, 2013 are each VACATED. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/27/2013.(rmcd)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Setting Case for Trial. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for 9/16/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. A Four-Day Jury Trial is set for 9/30/2013 09:00 AM, 10/1/2013 09:00 AM, 10/2/2013, and 10/3/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 05/22/13. (alvsl)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/23/2013. (kmtcd)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER DENYING 21 Motion for Protective Order the proposed Protective Order is REFUSED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/26/2012.(ervsl, )
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2012 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/19/2012. (kmtcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stout, v. Gyrodata, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry A. Stout
Represented By: Bryan E. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gyrodata, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Matthew John Rita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?