Scott v. City of Colorado Springs
Plaintiff: Danielle Scott
Defendant: City of Colorado Springs
Case Number: 1:2012cv01028
Filed: April 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting the Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice 65 filed March 18, 2015, each party to bear their own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/19/15. (ktera)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER granting 62 Plaintiffs Motion for Referral to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix Regarding Final Settlement Document Dispute and Extension to File Dismissal Paper. Dismissal Paper due by 3/18/2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on March 4, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. counsel shall jointly call chambers at (303) 335-2770 for an off-the-record discussion with the undersigned regarding the parties impediments to final settlement of this matter. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/26/2016.(evana, )
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 6/8/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/20/2014. (jsmit)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF AARON J. PRATT re 51 Notice : Attorney Aaron John Pratt is withdrawn and NEF terminated. Richard A. Orona remains counsel for the defendant in this matter, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/22/2014. (jsmit)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Deeming 23 Motion for Summary Judgment Moot re 40 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/12/2014.(rpmcd )
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Motion for Leave to File First AmendedComplaint re 1 /[38-1]: First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand attached thereto is accepted for filing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/20/2014.(rpmcd)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Courtroom Minutes for Scheduling Conference held on 8/3/2012 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Claim for Relief Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(1) 5 , is granted with respect to plaintiff's claim of pattern and practice of disparate treatment and discovery is limited as stated on record. Scheduling Order signed.FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/1/2012 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on July 26, 2012, lead counsel present in person and no parties or representatives of parties permitted to attend, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/19/2012. (rpmcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. City of Colorado Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Scott
Represented By: Leah P. VanLandschoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Colorado Springs
Represented By: Tracy Miller Lessig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?