January 8, 2016 |
Filing
236
ORDER of Dismissal re: 234 Stipulation of Dismissal of Case. Ordered that all claims by and between plaintiff and defendants are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Ordered that this case shall be closed in its entirety. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/8/2016. (agarc, )
|
November 13, 2015 |
Filing
220
ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Certification of Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) 190 is DENIED. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/13/15.(pabsec)
|
September 3, 2015 |
Filing
181
ORDER. ORDERED that defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 156 is GRANTED. ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against Officer Bowser are DISMISSED. ORDERED that plaintiffs Fourth Amendment claims for false arrest and malicious prosecution against Corporal Chavez, Officer Gasca, and Officer Garcia are DISMISSED. ORDERED that plaintiffs Fourteenth Amendment claims are DISMISSED. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/03/15.(jhawk, )
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
180
ORDER Setting Case for Trial. Jury Trial set for 11/30/2015 08:00 AM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/6/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/26/15. (jhawk, )
|
October 28, 2014 |
Filing
155
MINUTE ORDER granting 143 Denver Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, as set forth in the order. Plaintiff Irene Rodriguez shall provide to the Denver Defendants a full and complete response to the Denver Defendants' Request for Production (RFP) No. 2 on or before 11/7/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/28/2014.(emill)
|
September 16, 2014 |
Filing
145
ORDER granting 95 Partial Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that Gerald R. Whitman and the City and County of Denver are DISMISSED from the case. ORDERED that the claims against Christine Chavez, Joey Gasca, Kristy Garcia, and Damon Bowser in their official capacities are DISMISSED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/16/14.(jhawk, )
|
July 11, 2014 |
Filing
142
MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant' Fifth Supplemental Disclosure Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) (Docket No. 139) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendan ts Fifth Supplemental Disclosure Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) (Docket No. 132) is WITHDRAWN. ORDERED that plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Fourth Supplemental Disclosure Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) (Docket No. 140) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendant's Fourth Supplemental Disclosure Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) (Docket No. 133) is WITHDRAWN by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/11/14.(jhawk, )
|
June 23, 2014 |
Filing
135
MINUTE ORDER granting 131 Motion to Allow for Depositions to be Taken at the Federal Courthouse by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/23/14.(jhawk, ) Modified on 6/23/2014 (jhawk, ).
|
May 30, 2014 |
Filing
129
MINUTE ORDER denying 119 Motion for Protective Order and Objection to Depositions of Irene Rodriguez, Armando Bustos-Meza, and Clyde MacArthur by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/30/14.(jhawk, )
|
May 28, 2014 |
Filing
128
MINUTE ORDER granting 124 Motion for Leave of Court to File Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order and Objection to Depositions of Irene Rodriguez, Armando Bustos-Meza and Clyde MacArthur Out of Time. Plaintiff's Reply (Docket No. 125) is accepted for filing and will be considered by the court by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/28/14.(jhawk, )
|
December 27, 2013 |
Filing
107
ORDER: Upon the filing of the parties' stipulation [Docket No. 103 ],plaintiff's claims were dismissed with prejudice as to defendant Gerald R. Whitman individually. To the extent the stipulation was filed as a motion, it is denied as moot. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/27/2013.(klyon, )
|
May 1, 2013 |
Filing
82
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's 80 Motion for Clarification is granted insofar as the court provides in this order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/1/13.(mnfsl, )
|
April 9, 2013 |
Filing
76
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL. denying 47 Motion to Compel; denying 48 Motion to Compel; denying 49 Motion to Compel; denying 50 Motion to Compel; denying 51 Motion to Compel; denying 52 Motion to Compel. Denying Plain tiff's request for sanctions. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 4/30/ 2013 to serve defendants with revised Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories which are consistent with this order and within the limits set forth in the court's Scheduling Order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/9/2013.(mjwcd)
|
February 6, 2013 |
Filing
43
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 39 Motion to Compel Disclosure. Plaintiff's 42 request for attorney's fees, costs, and sanctions made in her reply is denied. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/6/13.(mnfsl, )
|
October 9, 2012 |
Filing
33
MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall have up to and including 10/18/2012 to submit a stipulated Protective Order. Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Protective Order is denied without prejudice. Defendants' 31 Motion to Strike is denied as moot. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/9/12.(mnfsl, )
|
June 13, 2012 |
Filing
21
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/13/12. (pabcd)
|
April 26, 2012 |
Filing
7
ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/26/2012. (skssl, )
|