Elliott v. Essex Motors, LLC

Plaintiff: Kristan Elliott
Defendant: Essex Motors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv01078
Filed: April 23, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/3/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three (3) day Jury Trial set for 5/20/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/1/12. (rebsec, )
September 13, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion to Stay. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/13/12.(mjgsl, )
March 18, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 8 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 25 is DENIED as moot; The parties SHALL PROCEED to arbitration; This case is STAYED pending the outcome of the arbitration of the claims of the pl aintiff; The Trial Preparation Conference set 5/3/2013 and the trial set to commence on 5/20/2013 are VACATED; The clerk is DIRECTED to close this case administratively, subject to reopening for good cause. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/18/13. (kfinn, )
March 18, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. This order SUPPLANTS and SUPERSEDES the Order Granting Motion To Compel Arbitration 30 . By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/18/13. (kfinn, )
April 24, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE: Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/11/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/24/12. (Attachments: # 1 Instuctions for Preparation of Scheduling Order, # 2 Proposed Scheduling Order, # 3 Notice of Availability of A United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction) (mjgsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Essex Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristan Elliott
Represented By: Jill Gookin
Represented By: Andrea Carter Fulton
Represented By: Troy Dean Krenning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essex Motors, LLC
Represented By: Michael Graeme McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.