Measurement Specialties Inc. v. Component Distributors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Measurement Specialties Inc.
Defendant: Component Distributors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01155
Filed: May 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re: 10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This case and all claims asserted against Defendant Component Distributors, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/19/12. (mnfsl, )
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re: 10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/18/12. (mnfsl, )
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/31/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/15/12. (mnfsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Measurement Specialties Inc. v. Component Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Measurement Specialties Inc.
Represented By: William Lloyd Bartow
Represented By: Darius C. Gambino
Represented By: James R. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Component Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?