Kansas Wheat Alliance, Inc. et al v. Thunderbird Seed Conditioning LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kansas Wheat Alliance, Inc. and Kansas State University Research Foundation
Defendant: Thunderbird Seed Conditioning LLC and Thunderbird Commodities LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv01171
Filed: May 7, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:2321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED CONSENT JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTION. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/17/2014. (trlee, )
November 6, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 81 the Opposed Amended Motion to Compel Nonparty Ron Drosselmeyer to Comply with Subpoena Duces Tecum, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/6/2013. (mehcd)
October 23, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 74 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Nonparty Ron Dresselmeyer to Comply with Subpoena Duces Tecum, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/23/2013. (mehcd)
October 17, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint and Add Parties. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the [66-1] Second Amended Complaint. Defendants shall respond to the Second Amended Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 and all applicable local and federal rules. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/17/2013. (mehcd)
October 3, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendants Thunderbird Seed Conditioning, LLC's and Thunderbird Commodities LLC's 51 Motion for Summary Judgment under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 is denied. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/3/13.(mnfsl, )
September 25, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 9/25/2013, taking under advisement 51 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' response to 66 Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion to Amend Complaint and Add Parties is due by 10/15/2013. The Clerk of the Court shall lift any restrictions on all documents in this case. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
May 22, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/22/2013. (mehcd)
May 17, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 46 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/17/2013. (mehcd)
April 15, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Defendants Thunderbird Seed Conditioning, LLC and Thunderbird Commodities LLC'S Motion to Dismiss under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/15/13.(mnfsl, )
February 7, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Defendants Thunderbird Seed Conditioning, LLC and Thunderbird Commodities LLC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c). Entry of judgment in favor of Defendant shall be stayed for a period of 10 days following this Order, in the event Plaintiffs choose to file an Amended Complaint, for which leave is granted. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/7/2013. (mehcd)
October 18, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PROCEDURES ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/18/2012. (mehcd)
May 9, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 05/09/2012. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kansas Wheat Alliance, Inc. et al v. Thunderbird Seed Conditioning LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas Wheat Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Darin James Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas State University Research Foundation
Represented By: Darin James Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunderbird Seed Conditioning LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunderbird Commodities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?