Waring, v. Astrue,
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Waring
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv01178
Filed: May 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Raymond A. Waring against Michael J. Astrue re: 28 Order on Motion to Remand to Agency, by Clerk on 7/31/2013. (klyon, )
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Vacating Order for Remand and Judgment. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment 21 is GRANTED. The Order and Judgment for Remand 19 and 20 are VACATED. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 12/20/12 to respond to the Defendant's Opposed Motion to Remand 18 , by Judge John L. Kane on 12/10/12.(sgrim)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINAL JUDGMENT re: 19 Order, by Clerk on 11/26/12. (sgrim)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 9/24/2012. SS Defendants Brief due by 10/24/2012. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 11/8/2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 8/14/12. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waring, v. Astrue,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Waring
Represented By: Patrick C.H. Spencer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?