Coral Production Corporation v. Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Plaintiff: Coral Production Corporation
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01305
Filed: May 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: 63 MOTION for Protective Order Quashing Coral Production Corporation's January 28, 2013 Notice of FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/28/13. (bnbcd, )
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: Status Report due by 5:00 PM 3/26/2013. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/7/13. (dkals, )
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER of Recusal by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/16/12. (dkals, )
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: 14 Designation of Non-Party is WITHDRAWN and 20 Motion to Strike Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Designation of Non-Party at Fault is DENIED as moot. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/11/12.(bnbcd, )
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Status Report due by 9/10/2012 addressing stipulation as discussed today at the motion hearing. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/29/12. (bnbcd, )
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/27/12. (dkals, )
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/9/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/31/12. (mnfsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coral Production Corporation v. Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coral Production Corporation
Represented By: Michael John Dommermuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Lepore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?