Carter v. Lotspeich, et al

Plaintiff: Heather Carter
Defendant: Richard M Lotspeich, PA C, David C. Loucks and Peak Orthopedics and Spine, P.L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01381
Filed: May 25, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2015 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/22/15. (rkeec)
August 20, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel: Trial Preparation Conference held on 8/20/2015. Granting in part, denying in part, and deferring ruling on in part 100 Motion in Limine. Granting 115 Stipulation to Allow Testimony by Video Conference. Court Reporter: Mary George. (rkeec)
October 7, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 79 to Remove CM/ECF Notifications/Service on Christopher K. Miller, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/7/2014.(evana, )
May 9, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 44 Motion for Costs entered by Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/9/13. (wydcd, rrk)
January 29, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. "Defendants Richard M. Lotspeich, PA-C's and Peak Orthopedics and Spine, PLLC's Supplement to its Motion to Conduct Ex Parte Meetings with Certain Health Care Providers" 32 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 01/29/13. (jjhsl, )
January 25, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Conduct Ex Parte Interviews with Certain Health Care Providers. ORDERED that Peak Orthopedics and Spine, PLLC and Mr. Lotspeich and their counsel may engage in ex parte interviews with the following providers without first providing notice to Plaintiff or her counsel: providers from the Medical Center of Aurora; Peak Orthopedics and Spine, PLLC; and Sky Ridge Medical Center by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 01/25/13.(jjhsl, )
October 10, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/10/2012. (kmtcd)
August 21, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2012 10:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/21/2012. (kmtcd)
June 15, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/15/2012. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Lotspeich, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Carter
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M Lotspeich, PA C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Loucks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak Orthopedics and Spine, P.L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?