Flaherty v. Continental Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Flaherty
Defendant: Boeing Company, The, McDonnell Douglas Corporation and Continental Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01460
Filed: June 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay costs incurred, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/20/2012. (ervsl, )
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of Recusal. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/18/12. (mjgsl, )
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: 4 Complaint filed by Brenda Flaherty by Robert L. McGahey, Jr., District Court Judge on 05/30/2012. (dbera, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flaherty v. Continental Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company, The
Represented By: Robert Nolen Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonnell Douglas Corporation
Represented By: Robert Nolen Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: John Peter Streelman
Represented By: Mark Thomas Clouatre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Flaherty
Represented By: James Todd Tenge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?