King v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Noel King
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv01479
Filed: June 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, the Commissioner's decision is AFFIRMED. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/01/13. (alvsl)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave. SS Defendants Brief due by 1/10/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 1/24/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 12/14/12.(sgrim)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 12/7/2012. SS Defendants Brief due by 1/8/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 1/22/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/23/12. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel King
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?