Davies v. Seven Falls Company
Plaintiff: Karl T. Anderson and Amber Davies
Defendant: A. G. Hill Partners, LLC and Seven Falls Company a Delaware corporation doing business as New Seven Falls Company, The doing business as Cottage Company, The doing business as Seven Falls Pipeline & Reservoir
Case Number: 1:2012cv01490
Filed: June 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 REVISED ORDER re: #228 Order on Motion for Release of Funds by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/3/2017. (cthom, )
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting #225 Motion for Release of Funds by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/1/2017. (cthom, )
July 29, 2017 Filing 227 Exhibits in Support of #225 MOTION for Release of Funds (Proposed Order) by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson is instructed to file a proposed order on or before July 31, 2017, for the relief sought in the Motion for Release of Funds #225 . SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/27/2017. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 26, 2017 Filing 225 MOTION for Release of Funds by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
July 5, 2017 Filing 224 MANDATE of USCA as to #223 USCA Order/Opinion/Judgment, #218 Notice of Appeal filed by Karl T. Anderson : (USCA Case No. 16-1377) (cthom, )
June 12, 2017 Filing 223 USCA Order and Judgment as to #218 Notice of Appeal filed by Karl T. Anderson : We AFFIRM the district court's grant of summary judgment on judicial estoppel grounds. (USCA Case No. 16-1377) (This document is not the Mandate) (Attachments: #1 Cover letter to Order and Judgment)(evana, )
September 28, 2016 Filing 222 LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to #218 Notice of Appeal filed by Karl T. Anderson. A transcript order form was filed stating that a transcript is not necessary. ( Appeal No. 16-1377) Text Only Entry (cthom, )
September 28, 2016 Filing 221 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #218 Notice of Appeal by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson (Gehlhausen, John)
September 16, 2016 Filing 220 USCA Case Number 16-1377 for #218 Notice of Appeal filed by Karl T. Anderson. (cthom, )
September 15, 2016 Filing 219 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #218 Notice of Appeal filed by Karl T. Anderson to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet and Preliminary Record)(cthom, )
September 15, 2016 Filing 218 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #146 Order, by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number 1082-5157358) (Gehlhausen, John)
September 15, 2016 Filing 217 FINAL JUDGMENT pursuant to #216 Order. Entered by the Clerk of the Court on 9/15/2016. (cpear)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER: Judgment shall enter in favor of Plaintiff, Karl T. Anderson, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Robert Leone Davis and Amber Tracey Davis. This case is administratively closed. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/15/2016. (cpear)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon the filing of defendant Seven Falls Company's motion to deposit funds into the court registry ("the motion") (ECF No. 210). The motion is GRANTED. Defendant is ORDERED forthwith to deposit $28,650.58 into the court registry. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/1/2016. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
August 30, 2016 Filing 215 RECEIPT for $28,650.58 re: 214 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds (cthom, )
August 30, 2016 Filing 213 RESPONSE to #210 MOTION to Deposit Funds into the Court Registry filed by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MINUTE ORDER: Other than objections to the Court's February 12, 2014 decision and its findings in the August 19, 2016 Order, which plaintiff can bring on appeal, plaintiff is ORDERED to file, on or before August 31, 2016, a response if any to defendant's motion at ECF No. 210. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/25/2016. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 25, 2016 Filing 211 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #210 MOTION to Deposit Funds into the Court Registry filed by attorney Alan Avery. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (cthom, )
August 25, 2016 Filing 210 MOTION to Deposit Funds into the Court Registry by Defendants A. G. Hill Partners, LLC, Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Avery, Alan)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MINUTE ORDER: On or before August 30, 2016, Defendant shall file a motion for leave to deposit the amount required to satisfy the Court's August 19, 2016 Order (ECF No. 207). SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/24/2016. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 23, 2016 Filing 208 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Defendants A. G. Hill Partners, LLC, Seven Falls Company (Avery, Alan)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER re: Costs and Fees by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 08/19/2016. (cthom, )
May 17, 2016 Filing 206 Exhibits in Support of #205 Statement Plaintiff's Counter Position Statement on Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-pp. 201-390, #2 Exhibit A-pp. 391-591, #3 Exhibit A-pp. 592-799, #4 Exhibit A-pp. 800-1007)(Gehlhausen, John)
May 17, 2016 Filing 205 STATEMENT Plaintiff's Counter Position Statement on Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G)(Gehlhausen, John)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER denying #203 Motion for Extension of Time to File. This matter comes before the Court upon plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file a response ("the motion") (ECF No. 203). The motion is DENIED. Counsel has been given more than adequate time to prepare, research, and draft arguments pertaining to the fees/costs issues in this case. Moreover, counsel has been aware of defendant's "broad" objections to the fees and costs for quite some time. Finally, counsel agreed to the deadlines the Court imposed at the March 18, 2016 hearing. If the parties wish to negotiate the issues still pending, they have more than sufficient time prior to the May 20, 2016 response deadline and thereafter. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/26/2016. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
April 25, 2016 Filing 203 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Def's Position Statement Regarding Fees and Costs Plaintiff is Entitled to Recover Pursuant to the Bankruptcy Code (ECF Doc. No. 202) by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gehlhausen, John)
April 20, 2016 Filing 202 STATEMENT re #201 Status Conference,, Set/Reset Deadlines, Position Statement Regarding Fees and Costs Plaintiff is Entitled to recover Pursuant to the Bankruptcy Code by Defendants A. G. Hill Partners, LLC, Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Position Statement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Position Statement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Position Statement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Position Statement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Position Statement)(Avery, Alan)
March 18, 2016 Filing 201 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Raymond P. Moore: Status Conference held on 3/18/2016. Defendant's counsel shall file a pleading regarding the bankruptcy code referenced by the Court by 4/20/2016, and Plaintiff's counsel shall file a response to the pleading by 5/20/2016. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (cpear)
March 15, 2016 Filing 200 REPLY to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Position Statement on Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
March 15, 2016 Filing 199 REPLY to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Bill of Costs Submitted Pursuant to this Court's Minute Order of February 3, 2016 by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Fee Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Form Fee Application, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit of Patricia Johnson, #4 Exhibit D-Shulman Hodges Bastian Fees & Costs)(Gehlhausen, John)
March 8, 2016 Filing 198 RESPONSE to #195 Statement by Defendants A. G. Hill Partners, LLC, Seven Falls Company. (Avery, Alan)
March 8, 2016 Filing 197 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #196 Response :Alan Avery has failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases), which mandate, with exceptions inapplicable here, that all documents shall be converted directly to portable document format (PDF) from software applications in which they were created (i.e., no scanned documents). Failure in the future to follow these procedures may lead to mandatory CM/ECF training or action by the court. (Text Only Entry) (cthom, )
March 8, 2016 Filing 196 RESPONSE to #194 Proposed Bill of Costs, by Defendants A. G. Hill Partners, LLC, Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Avery, Alan)
February 23, 2016 Filing 195 STATEMENT Plaintiff's Position Statement on Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit F)(Gehlhausen, John)
February 23, 2016 Filing 194 Proposed Bill of Costs Submitted Pursuant to Court's Minute Order of February 3, 2016 by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Gehlhausen, John)
February 3, 2016 Filing 193 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Raymond P. Moore: Status Conference held on 2/3/2016. #154 Defendant's Motion for a Determination of Costs and Fees and #155 Defendant's Motion to Preclude Special Counsel Gehlhausen and Sargent from Recovering Costs or a Contingent Fee Based on Costs From any Judgment Awarded by the Court Based on the Doctrine of Judicial Estoppel are DENIED AS MOOT. Further Status Conference set for 3/18/2016 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (cpear)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MINUTE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/3/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore on the sixth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado.SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/22/2016. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 22, 2016 Filing 191 Joint STATUS REPORT Required by Court Order of February 4, 2015, ECF Document No. 188 by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gehlhausen, John)
January 22, 2016 Filing 190 MANDATE of USCA as to #180 Notice of Appeal filed by Karl T. Anderson : (USCA Case No. 14-1515) (cthom, )
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER of USCA as to #180 Notice of Appeal filed by Karl T. Anderson. (USCA Case No. 14-1515) (cthom, )
February 4, 2015 Filing 188 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Raymond P. Moore: Status Conference held on 2/4/2015. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (cpear)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #183 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal. The Court grants Plaintiff's motion to the extent it seeks a stay with respect to the parties' filing obligations as set forth in the Court's prior order of December 19, 2014 (ECF No. 174). The Court denies Plaintiff's motion to the extent it seeks a stay in the hearing set for February 4, 2015 (ECF No. 179). The hearing on February 4, 2015 will be a status conference and not a motion hearing with respect to Defendants' motion for determination of costs & fees (ECF No. 154) or Defendants' motion to preclude special counsel from recovering (ECF No. 155). SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/14/15. Text Only Entry(rmlc2)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER of USCA as to #180 Notice of Appeal filed by Karl T. Anderson. (USCA Case No. 14-1515). Briefing on the merits is TOLLED pending further order of the court. The court is considering summary disposition of this appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction. (tscha, )
January 12, 2015 Filing 185 LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to #180 Notice of Appeal filed by Karl T. Anderson. A transcript order form was filed stating that a transcript is not necessary. ( Appeal No. 14-1515). Text Only Entry (tscha, )
January 9, 2015 Filing 184 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #180 Notice of Appeal from Order (ECF 146) by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson (Gehlhausen, John)
December 31, 2014 Filing 183 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gehlhausen, John)
December 29, 2014 Filing 182 USCA Case Number 14-1515 for #180 Notice of Appeal filed by Karl T. Anderson. (tscha, )
December 26, 2014 Filing 181 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #180 Notice of Appeal filed by Karl T. Anderson to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Preliminary Record)(tscha, )
December 24, 2014 Filing 180 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #146 Order, by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number 1082-4198390) (Gehlhausen, John)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting #177 Motion to Reset. Motion Hearing RESET for 2/4/2015 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/23/2014. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #175 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Zachary Steven Westerfield is terminated as counsel of record on behalf of Defendant. The Clerk of Court is instructed to remove Mr. Westerfield from the Notice of Electronic Filing. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/23/14.(cbssec)
December 23, 2014 Filing 177 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Hearing Scheduled for January 29, 2015 by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Gehlhausen, John)
December 22, 2014 Filing 176 MEMORANDUM regarding #175 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Zachary S. Westerfield filed by A. G. Hill Partners, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/22/2014. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
December 22, 2014 Filing 175 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Zachary S. Westerfield by Defendant A. G. Hill Partners, LLC. (Avery, Alan)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MINUTE ORDER. Motion Hearing on [ECF No. 154] Motion for Determination of Costs & Fees; and [ECF No. 155] Motion to Preclude Special Counsel from Recovering. Hearing will be held on 1/29/15 at 9 AM in Courtroom A601, 6th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed Bill of Costs including supporting documentation and declarations for all fees and costs sought in this matter, particularly a more detailed accounting of the amounts claimed in the breakdown previously provided by Plaintiff in [ECF No. 140, p. 7], by close of business on January 15, 2015. Any response by Defendant to the proposed Bill of Costs by January 22, 2015. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/19/2014. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
December 17, 2014 Filing 173 REPLY to Response to #155 MOTION for Sanctions TO PRECLUDE SPECIAL COUNSEL GEHLHAUSEN AND SARGENT FROM RECOVERING COSTS OR A CONTINGENT FEE BASED ON COSTS FROM ANY JUDGMENT AWARDED BY THIS COURT BASED ON THE DOCTRINE OF JUDICIAL ESTOPPEL filed by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Avery, Alan)
December 17, 2014 Filing 172 REPLY to Response to #154 MOTION to Clarify re #146 Order, FOR A DETERMINATION OF COSTS AND FEES filed by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Avery, Alan)
December 4, 2014 Filing 171 RESPONSE to #155 MOTION for Sanctions TO PRECLUDE SPECIAL COUNSEL GEHLHAUSEN AND SARGENT FROM RECOVERING COSTS OR A CONTINGENT FEE BASED ON COSTS FROM ANY JUDGMENT AWARDED BY THIS COURT BASED ON THE DOCTRINE OF JUDICIAL ESTOPPEL filed by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gehlhausen, John)
December 4, 2014 Filing 170 RESPONSE to #154 MOTION to Clarify re #146 Order, FOR A DETERMINATION OF COSTS AND FEES filed by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Gehlhausen, John)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying #148 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #166 Motion for Hearing/Conference. The parties have 10 days from the date of this Order to file any remaining responsive briefing on any and all pending motions. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/25/2014. (athom, )
September 30, 2014 Filing 167 RESPONSE to #166 MOTION for Hearing/Conference filed by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
September 24, 2014 Filing 166 MOTION for Hearing/Conference by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Westerfield, Zachary)
September 10, 2014 Filing 168 RECEIPT 064686; re: 165 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds (tscha, )
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Order: Defendant's Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 69(a) to Deposit $17,011.46 Into the Court Registry [ECF No. 141] is hereby GRANTED. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/8/2014. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
July 25, 2014 Filing 164 COURTROOM MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held on 7/25/2014 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Parties believe this case cannot reach settlement. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (bsimm)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE ORDER: due to the demands of the court's docket on 7/8/14 the telephone status conference set in this matter for that same date was, regrettably, not held. In light of counsel's telephone conversation with court staff, it is ORDERED that a Telephone Status Conference will be held on 7/25/2014 at 9:00 AM (Mountain Time) before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Anderson shall participate, along with his counsel, in the call. Parties shall coordinate to create a conference call first before contacting the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/10/14. (cbssec)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MINUTE ORDER pushing back the start time for the 7/8/14 Telephone Status Conference by 15 minutes. ORDERED that the hearing will begin at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Counsel shall coordinate to create a conference call first before contacting the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/3/14. (cbssec)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER setting a Telephone Status Conference for Tuesday, July 8, 2014 at 10:45 a.m. Mountain Time in Courtroom A-402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Counsel participating in the Conference shall first initiate a conference call among themselves and then call the court at (303) 844-21117 at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 06/09/2014. Text Only Entry (cbslc1)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MINUTE ORDER: Due to an emergency conflict on the court's calendar, the Settlement Conference set for today, May 9, 2014 at 3:30 p.m. is VACATED, to be reset upon further notice to the court from the parties. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 05/09/2014. Text Only Entry (cbslc1)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTE ORDER: A further Settlement Conference is set for May 9, 2014 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom A-402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 05/05/2014. Text Only Entry (cbslc1)
April 25, 2014 Filing 158 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Settlement Conference held on 4/25/2014. No settlement was reached as to any claims. (ccovi)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #156 Motion to Stay. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/22/2014. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
April 22, 2014 Filing 156 Unopposed MOTION to Stay of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motions, ECF Doc. No. 154 and ECF Doc. No. 155 by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gehlhausen, John)
April 18, 2014 Filing 155 MOTION for Sanctions TO PRECLUDE SPECIAL COUNSEL GEHLHAUSEN AND SARGENT FROM RECOVERING COSTS OR A CONTINGENT FEE BASED ON COSTS FROM ANY JUDGMENT AWARDED BY THIS COURT BASED ON THE DOCTRINE OF JUDICIAL ESTOPPEL by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Avery, Alan)
April 18, 2014 Filing 154 MOTION to Clarify re #146 Order, FOR A DETERMINATION OF COSTS AND FEES by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Avery, Alan)
April 14, 2014 Filing 153 REPLY to Response to #148 MOTION for Reconsideration Of Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gehlhausen, John)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #151 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/14/2014. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
April 11, 2014 Filing 151 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gehlhausen, John)
April 1, 2014 Filing 150 RESPONSE to #148 MOTION for Reconsideration Of Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Westerfield, Zachary)
March 24, 2014 Filing 149 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
March 11, 2014 Filing 148 MOTION for Reconsideration Of Summary Judgment #146 by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gehlhausen, John) Modified on 3/11/2014 to create linkage (trlee, ).
February 26, 2014 Filing 147 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/26/2014. ORDERED: A Settlement Conference is set for 4/25/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Counsel are to each submit confidential settlement statements to the court no later than 4/9/2014. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER in re: hearing at entry #135 , Trial Preparation Conference. This Court GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Judicial Estoppel in open court. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/12/2014. (trlee, )
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MINUTE ORDER setting a Telephonic Status Conference on 2/26/2014 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Consistent with the instructions provided by District Judge Moore during the hearing held on 2/7/2014, Karl Anderson is ORDERED to participate and his counsel shall provide him with a copy of this Minute Order. To ensure the clearest connection possible, the services of a third party conferencing center shall be utilized. Counsel for Plaintiff has volunteered to make the arrangements and distribute the call-in number and passcode. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/11/14. (cbssec)
February 7, 2014 Filing 144 MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held on 2/7/2014 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. The Court grants #142 Motion to Vacate. Trial set to commence on February 18, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. is vacated. Status Report due by 3/24/2014. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (rmcd)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MINUTE ORDER: A telephonic Status Conference is set for Friday, February 7, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Parties should contact Nicholas Richards at 303-335-2180 to arrange appearing by telephone at least 48 hours in advance of the hearing. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/3/2013. ( Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 31, 2014 Filing 142 MOTION to Vacate Trial by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Avery, Alan)
January 31, 2014 Filing 141 MOTION to Deposit Funds Into the Court Registry by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Avery, Alan)
January 31, 2014 Filing 140 BRIEF of Plaintiff on Interpleader Issue and Also on Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
January 31, 2014 Filing 139 Proposed Jury Instructions Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
January 31, 2014 Filing 138 Proposed Jury Instructions Joint Stipulated Jury Instructions by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
January 31, 2014 Filing 137 TRANSCRIPT of Trial Preparation Conference held on January 23, 2014 before Judge Moore. Pages: 1-56.
< NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov.

< Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2014. (Hoffschildt, Tamara)
January 27, 2014 Filing 136 Exhibit List by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Avery, Alan)
January 23, 2014 Filing 135 MINUTE ENTRY for Trial Preparation Conference held on 1/23/2014 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. The Court finds as moot #68 Motion for Leave, denies #69 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, grants in part and denies in part #70 Motion for Summary Judgment, overrules #108 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court, denies without prejudice #109 Motion to Exclude, denies without prejudice #110 Motion to Exclude, grants in part and denies in part #128 Motion in Limine, denies without prejudice #129 Motion in Limine, denies without prejudice #130 Motion in Limine, and denies #131 Motion in Limine. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (rmcd)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MINUTE ORDER: If Defendant wishes to ask voir dire questions of the prospective jury members, Defendant shall file proposed voir dire questions with the Court by close of business on January 31, 2014. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/23/2014. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 22, 2014 Filing 133 RESPONSE to #131 Third MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO AMBER DAVIES AS AMBER filed by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
January 17, 2014 Filing 132 Witness List by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Avery, Alan)
January 16, 2014 Filing 131 Third MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO AMBER DAVIES AS AMBER by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Avery, Alan)
January 16, 2014 Filing 130 Second MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE READING INTO EVIDENCE TESTIMONY FROM DOCUMENTS CONTAINING MEDICAL INFORMATION by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Avery, Alan)
January 16, 2014 Filing 129 First MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY BY PLAINTIFFS EXPERT WITNESSES WHICH EXCEEDS THE SCOPE OF THEIR ENDORSEMENT OR CONSTITUTES IMPERMISSIBLE REBUTTAL EXPERT TESTIMONY by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Avery, Alan)
January 16, 2014 Filing 128 MOTION in Limine by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Gehlhausen, John)
January 16, 2014 Filing 127 Exhibit List by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
January 16, 2014 Filing 126 Witness List by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
January 16, 2014 Filing 125 Proposed Voir Dire by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
January 9, 2014 Filing 124 Proposed Verdict Form by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
January 9, 2014 Filing 123 Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
January 9, 2014 Filing 122 Proposed Verdict Form A and B by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Avery, Alan)
January 9, 2014 Filing 121 Proposed Jury Instructions by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Avery, Alan)
January 3, 2014 Filing 120 REPLY to Response to #110 MOTION to Exclude Speculative Expert Testimony as to the Cause of Amber Davies' Complex Regional Pain Syndrome filed by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
January 3, 2014 Filing 119 REPLY to Response to #109 MOTION to Exclude Defendant, Its Counsel, and/or Defendant's Expert Witnesses from Mentioning, or Referring to the State of Colorado Workers' Compensation Regulation's Diagnostic Criteria for Complex Regional Pain Syndrome filed by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gehlhausen, John)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #117 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/3/2014. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
January 3, 2014 Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motions in Limine by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gehlhausen, John)
December 20, 2013 Filing 116 RESPONSE to #109 MOTION to Exclude Defendant, Its Counsel, and/or Defendant's Expert Witnesses from Mentioning, or Referring to the State of Colorado Workers' Compensation Regulation's Diagnostic Criteria for Complex Regional Pain Syndrome filed by Defendants A. G. Hill Partners, LLC, Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A part 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B part 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B part 2, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Avery, Alan)
December 20, 2013 Filing 115 RESPONSE to #110 MOTION to Exclude Speculative Expert Testimony as to the Cause of Amber Davies' Complex Regional Pain Syndrome filed by Defendants A. G. Hill Partners, LLC, Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B part 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B part 3, #5 Exhibit)(Avery, Alan)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #113 Motion to Withdraw Document. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/17/2013. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
December 13, 2013 Filing 113 MOTION to Withdraw Document Motion to Strike and for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine by Defendant A. G. Hill Partners, LLC. (Avery, Alan)
December 13, 2013 Filing 112 RESPONSE to #111 MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANT, ITS COUNSEL, AND/OR DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESS FROM MENTIONING, OR REFERRING TO THE STATE OF COLORADO WORKERS COMPENSATION REGULATIONS DIAGNOSTIC CRITERIA FOR COMPLEX REGIONAL PAIN SYNDROME (Document #109) and Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude Speculative Expert Testimony as to the Cause of Amber Davies' Complex Regional Pain Syndrome (Document #110) for Failure to Comply with D.C.COLO.L.CIV.R. 7.1A filed by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gehlhausen, John)
December 12, 2013 Filing 111 WITHDRAWN: MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANT, ITS COUNSEL, AND/OR DEFENDANTS EXPERT WITNESS FROM MENTIONING, OR REFERRING TO THE STATE OF COLORADO WORKERS COMPENSATION REGULATIONS DIAGNOSTIC CRITERIA FOR COMPLEX REGIONAL PAIN SYNDROME #109 AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PRECLUDE SPECULATIVE EXPERT TESTIMONY AS TO THE CAUSE OF AMBER DAVIES COMPLEX REGIONAL PAIN SYNDROME #110 FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1A by Defendant A. G. Hill Partners, LLC. (Avery, Alan) Modified on 12/13/2013 to add linkage (trlee, ). Modified on 12/17/2013 to withdraw per 114 (trlee, ).
November 22, 2013 Filing 110 MOTION to Exclude Speculative Expert Testimony as to the Cause of Amber Davies' Complex Regional Pain Syndrome by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gehlhausen, John)
November 22, 2013 Filing 109 MOTION to Exclude Defendant, Its Counsel, and/or Defendant's Expert Witnesses from Mentioning, or Referring to the State of Colorado Workers' Compensation Regulation's Diagnostic Criteria for Complex Regional Pain Syndrome by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Gehlhausen, John)
August 1, 2013 Filing 108 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re #106 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Permit Disclosure of Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Gehlhausen, John)
July 30, 2013 Filing 107 NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities Citation of Additional Authority Regarding Defense Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Judicial Estoppel re: #92 Reply to Response to Motion, #82 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Judicial Estoppel Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56 by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Quin v. County of Kauai Department of Transportation)(Gehlhausen, John)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER REGARDING #71 MOTION TO PERMIT DISCLOSURE OF PLAINTIFF'S REBUTTAL EXPERT signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/18/13. (cbssec)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/16/13. All expert reports are STRICKEN from the exhibit list as stated on the record. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Exhibit List, #2 Defendant's Exhibit List) (ccovi)
July 16, 2013 Filing 104 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Final Pretrial Conference held on 7/16/2013. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Setting Case for Trial. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for 1/23/2014 at 01:00 PM before Judge Raymond P. Moore. A Seven-Day Jury Trial is set for 2/18/2014 09:00 AM, 2/19/2014 09:00 AM, 2/20/2014 09:00 AM, 2/21/2014 09:00 AM, 2/24/2014 09:00 AM, 2/25/2014 09:00 AM, 2/26/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/16/13. (alvsl)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER modifying the start time of the Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2013. ORDERED that the hearing will begin at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/12/13. (cbssec)
July 11, 2013 Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on July 1, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Pages: 1-32. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2013. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
July 9, 2013 Filing 100 Proposed Pretrial Order Jointly Filed by the Parties by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Exhibit List)(Westerfield, Zachary)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Extension of Time to object to the court's 7/2/13 oral ruling denying Plaintiff's #71 Motion for Discovery. In addition to the record made during the 7/2/13 hearing, the court is going to issue a written order. Plaintiff's deadline to file written objections will be 14 days from the date the written order is filed. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/8/13. (cbssec)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM regarding #96 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to 7.2.13 Order filed by Karl T. Anderson. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/8/2013. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER modifying the start time for the Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2013 due to a conflict on the court's calendar. ORDERED that the hearing will begin at 8:00 a.m. in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/9/13. (cbssec)
July 7, 2013 Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to 7.2.13 Order by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gehlhausen, John)
July 2, 2013 Filing 95 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 7/2/2013. #71 Motion for Discovery is DENIED, written order to follow. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
June 18, 2013 Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on April 18, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Pages: 1-60. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2013. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
June 11, 2013 Filing 93 REPLY to Response to #69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim For Exemplary Damages filed by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Westerfield, Zachary)
June 11, 2013 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Judicial Estoppel Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56 filed by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M, #2 Exhibit N, #3 Exhibit O, #4 Exhibit P)(Westerfield, Zachary)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply up to and including June 10, 2013. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/10/2013. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
June 7, 2013 Filing 90 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim For Exemplary Damages, #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Judicial Estoppel Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56 (Second Motion) by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Westerfield, Zachary)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #88 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for the filing of any Reply Brief related to the Motions for Summary Judgment be on or before June 7, 2013. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/5/2013. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
June 4, 2013 Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim For Exemplary Damages, #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Judicial Estoppel Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56 by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Westerfield, Zachary)
June 4, 2013 Filing 87 Joint STATUS REPORT of the Parties by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document)(Westerfield, Zachary)
June 3, 2013 Filing 86 Proposed STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Joint Status Report)(Gehlhausen, John)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte. The parties are hereby directed to file a Joint Status Report by within 10 days, identifying the following: (1) the nature of the dispute between the parties, (2) the current status of the proceedings, (3) any and all pending motions, and (4) the prospects for settlement. This Report should not exceed 3 pages. The parties are invited to bring to the Court's attention any other issues which are relevant to the litigation, subject to the page limitation. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/24/2013. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
May 22, 2013 Filing 84 RESPONSE to #71 MOTION for Discovery To Permit Disclosure of Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert filed by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Avery, Alan)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/22/2013. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
May 21, 2013 Filing 82 BRIEF in Opposition to #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Judicial Estoppel Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56 filed by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Davies Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2-Bankruptcy Order)(Gehlhausen, John)
May 21, 2013 Filing 81 BRIEF in Opposition to #69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim For Exemplary Damages filed by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Johnson Depo, #2 Exhibit B-Photo of Walkway, #3 Exhibit C-Safety Hazards Log, #4 Exhibit D-Carter Depo, #5 Exhibit E-Photo of Gap, #6 Exhibit F-Safety Meeting, #7 Exhibit G-Safety Committee Minutes, #8 Exhibit H-R. Davies Depo, #9 Exhibit I-Map of Seven Falls)(Gehlhausen, John)
May 21, 2013 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response to Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gehlhausen, John)
May 17, 2013 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Hearing held on August 21, 2012 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Pages: 1-40. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2013. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
May 17, 2013 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Conference held on January 7, 2013 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Pages: 1-25. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2013. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
May 16, 2013 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference held on August 21, 2012 before Magistrate Judge Shaffer. Pages: 1-40. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2013. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER resetting hearing pursuant to an unopposed telephonic request made by counsel. ORDERED that the hearing on #71 MOTION for Discovery To Permit Disclosure of Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert has been reset to 7/1/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/10/13. (cbssec)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER setting a hearing on Plaintiff's #71 MOTION for To Permit Disclosure of Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert. ORDERED that a Motion Hearing will be held on 6/24/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/7/13. (cbssec)
May 6, 2013 Filing 74 ANSWER to #67 Amended Complaint by Seven Falls Company.(Avery, Alan)
May 6, 2013 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM regarding #71 MOTION for Discovery To Permit Disclosure of Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert filed by Karl T. Anderson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/6/2013. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec, )
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REASSIGNING JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore, upon his appointment. All future pleadings should reference Judge Moore at the end of the civil action number (such as 08-cv-00001-RM). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Judge Moore in Courtroom A-601. His chambers are located in Room A-638. His telephone number is 303-844-2784. (Text only entry - no document attached) (mjgsl, )
May 1, 2013 Filing 71 MOTION for Discovery To Permit Disclosure of Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert by Plaintiff Karl T. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Case Law - Mabrey v. USA)(Gehlhausen, John)
April 30, 2013 Filing 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Judicial Estoppel Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56 by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Westerfield, Zachary)
April 30, 2013 Filing 69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim For Exemplary Damages by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Westerfield, Zachary)
April 30, 2013 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File Motions for Summary Judgment in Excess of 20 Pages by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Westerfield, Zachary)
April 22, 2013 Filing 67 AMENDED COMPLAINT -SECOND against A. G. Hill Partners, LLC, Seven Falls Company, filed by Karl T. Anderson.(Gehlhausen, John)
April 18, 2013 Filing 66 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2013; #51 Motion to Amend is GRANTED. #56 Motion to Exclude is DENIED. #63 Motion to Substitute Party is GRANTED. Court Reporter: FTR - Monique Wiles. (klmcd, )
April 18, 2013 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM regarding #63 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Amber Davies. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/18/13. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
April 16, 2013 Filing 64 RESPONSE to #56 MOTION to Exclude Improperly Designated Expert Testimony filed by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Avery, Alan)
April 16, 2013 Filing 63 MOTION to Substitute Party by Plaintiff Amber Davies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gehlhausen, John)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER STRIKING #61 Motion to Substitute Party for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1A, which states in pertinent part, "[t]he court will not consider any motion,... unless counsel for the moving party... has conferred or made reasonable, good-faith efforts to confer with opposing counsel...." SO ORDERED BY Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/12/13. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
April 12, 2013 Filing 61 STRICKEN - MOTION to Substitute Party by Plaintiff Amber Davies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gehlhausen, John) Modified on 4/15/2013 to strike pursuant to 62 Order (dkals, ).
April 10, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Zachary S. Westerfield on behalf of Seven Falls Company (Westerfield, Zachary)
April 9, 2013 Filing 59 RESPONSE to #51 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #6 Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Avery, Alan)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER setting hearing on #56 MOTION to Exclude Improperly Designated Expert Testimony. ORDERED that a Motion Hearing will be held on 4/18/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall respond on or before 4/16/13. No reply will be permitted except with leave of the Court. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/26/13. (cbssec)
March 26, 2013 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM regarding #56 MOTION to Exclude Improperly Designated Expert Testimony filed by Amber Davies. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/26/13. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
March 26, 2013 Filing 56 MOTION to Exclude Improperly Designated Expert Testimony by Plaintiff Amber Davies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gehlhausen, John)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING #53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tanner J. Walls terminated as counsel for Defendant Seven Falls Company. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/25/13. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER setting hearing on #51 MOTION to Amend #6 Amended Complaint. ORDERED that a Motion Hearing will be held on 4/18/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline to file a response is on or before 4/9/13. No reply will be permitted except with leave of the court. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/25/13. (cbssec)
March 22, 2013 Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Tanner J. Walls by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Avery, Alan)
March 19, 2013 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM regarding #51 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #6 Amended Complaint filed by Amber Davies. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/19/13. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
March 19, 2013 Filing 51 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #6 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Amber Davies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Gehlhausen, John)
January 11, 2013 Filing 50 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 1/11/2013. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER setting a Telephonic Discovery Hearing on 1/11/2013 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, pursuant to the request of counsel for Defendant. Counsel shall coordinate to create a conference call among themselves before contacting the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/10/13. (cbssec)
January 7, 2013 Filing 48 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 1/7/2013. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER setting a Telephonic Discovery Hearing on 1/7/2013 at 9:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, pursuant to a request made by counsel. Counsel shall coordinate to create a conference call among themselves before contacting the court (303.844.2117) at the scheduled time. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/3/13. (cbssec)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina Marie Gilbertson and Daniel Sean Smith terminated as counsel for Defendant Seven Falls Company. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/18/12. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
December 17, 2012 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Seven Falls Company by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Seven Falls Company)(Gilbertson, Christina)
December 13, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tanner J. Walls on behalf of All Defendants (Walls, Tanner)
December 13, 2012 Filing 43 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alan D. Avery on behalf of All Defendants (Walls, Tanner) Modified on 12/14/2012 to correct name (dkals, ).
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting #35 Stipulation of Dismissal of Party filed by A. G. Hill Partners, LLC, and removing said party from the caption, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/2/12. (dkals, )
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Vacate and vacating the Early Neutral Evaluation scheduled for 11/29/12. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/2/12. (cbssec)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM regarding #39 Stipulated MOTION to Vacate #28 Order, re Early Neutral Evaluation Conference in Lieu of Private Mediation filed by Seven Falls Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/02/12. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
November 2, 2012 Filing 39 Stipulated MOTION to Vacate #28 Order, re Early Neutral Evaluation Conference in Lieu of Private Mediation by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Vacate Early Neutral Evaluation Conference in Lieu of Private Mediation)(Gilbertson, Christina)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Withdraw Document. ORDERED that #18 Motion to Dismiss is WITHDRAWN and the hearing set for 10/16/12 is VACATED. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/15/12.(cbssec)
October 15, 2012 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM regarding #36 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re #18 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) filed by A. G. Hill Partners, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/15/12. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
October 11, 2012 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re #18 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) by Defendant A. G. Hill Partners, LLC. (Gilbertson, Christina)
October 9, 2012 Filing 35 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Without Prejudice of A. G. Hill Partners, LLC by Defendant A. G. Hill Partners, LLC. (Gilbertson, Christina)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Setting Hearing on #18 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2). ORDERED that a Motion Hearing will be held on 10/16/2012 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer.Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/12/12. (cbssec)
September 6, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Sean Smith on behalf of A. G. Hill Partners, LLC, Seven Falls Company (Smith, Daniel)
September 4, 2012 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum upon Ken Villeneuve, Manager at Lonestar Steakhouse - Arvada on August 31, 2012, filed by Plaintiff Amber Davies (Gehlhausen, John)
September 4, 2012 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum upon Rene Padilla, Manager of Lonestar Steakhouse - Thornton on August 31, 2012, filed by Plaintiff Amber Davies (Gehlhausen, John)
September 4, 2012 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum upon The Corporation Company, Registered Agent for Lonestar Steakhouse on September 4, 2012, filed by Plaintiff Amber Davies (Gehlhausen, John)
September 4, 2012 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum upon Julia Morroni, Manager of Lonestar Steakhouse on August 31, 2012, filed by Plaintiff Amber Davies (Gehlhausen, John)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/30/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/9/2013. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference set for 11/29/2012 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2013 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/30/12. (dkals, )
August 24, 2012 Filing 27 Proposed Scheduling Order Amended by Plaintiff Amber Davies. (Gehlhausen, John)
August 21, 2012 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #18 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) filed by Defendant A. G. Hill Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Public Record Property Information)(Gilbertson, Christina)
August 21, 2012 Filing 25 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 8/21/2012. Discovery due by 3/30/2013, Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2013, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/9/2013, Amended Scheduling Order due on or before August 27, 2012. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference set for 11/29/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2013 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. FTR: Courtroom A402. (bnbcd, )
August 13, 2012 Filing 24 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Amber Davies. (Gehlhausen, John)
August 8, 2012 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #18 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) filed by Plaintiff Amber Davies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Gehlhausen, John)
July 30, 2012 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM regarding #18 First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) filed by A. G. Hill Partners, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/30/12. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
July 19, 2012 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gilbertson, Christina)
July 19, 2012 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gilbertson, Christina)
July 19, 2012 Filing 19 Defendant Seven Falls Company's ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial by Seven Falls Company.(Gilbertson, Christina)
July 19, 2012 Filing 18 WITHDRAWN - First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) by Defendant A. G. Hill Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order re Defendant A.G. Hill Partners, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2))(Gilbertson, Christina) Modified on 10/15/2012 to withdraw pursuant to 38 Order (dkals, ).
July 18, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by George E. McLaughlin on behalf of Amber Davies (McLaughlin, George)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Seven Falls Company's #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's #6 Amended Complaint. ORDERED that the deadline is extended to on or before 7/20/2012. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/18/12.(cbssec)
July 18, 2012 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Seven Falls Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/18/12. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
July 17, 2012 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Seven Falls Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant Seven Falls Company;s Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial)(Gilbertson, Christina)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant A.G. Hill shall have to and including 07/19/2012 within which to file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED BY Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/12/12. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
July 11, 2012 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #6 Amended Complaint by Defendant A. G. Hill Partners, LLC. (Knauf, Michael)
July 3, 2012 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amber Davies. A. G. Hill Partners, LLC served on 6/21/2012, answer due 7/12/2012; Seven Falls Company served on 6/21/2012, answer due 7/12/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Seven Falls Co)(Sargent, David)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER resetting hearing pursuant to request of counsel for Plaintiff. ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference is reset to 8/21/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Parties shall adhere to the instructions and deadlines previously set forth in the court's #5 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference. Text Only Entry by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/27/12. (cbssec)
June 27, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Dress Gehlhausen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gehlhausen, John)
June 21, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE To Court Of Caption Changes by Plaintiff Amber Davies (Sargent, David)
June 15, 2012 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (mnfsl, )
June 14, 2012 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Amber Davies. (Attachments: #1 Summons Seven Falls Company, #2 Summons A. G. Hill Partners, LLC, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Amended)(Sargent, David)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 8/23/2012 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/12/12. (cbssec)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Magistrate Judge Shaffer is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 07/12/2012 in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 60 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C. COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/12/12. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 8, 2012 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. (dbera, )
June 8, 2012 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
June 8, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 1082-2880932), filed by Amber Davies. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sargent, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davies v. Seven Falls Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. G. Hill Partners, LLC
Represented By: Alan D. Avery
Represented By: Daniel Sean Smith
Represented By: Tanner J. Walls
Represented By: Christina Marie Gilbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven Falls Company a Delaware corporation doing business as New Seven Falls Company, The doing business as Cottage Company, The doing business as Seven Falls Pipeline & Reservoir
Represented By: Daniel Sean Smith
Represented By: Tanner J. Walls
Represented By: Alan D. Avery
Represented By: Zachary Steven Westerfield
Represented By: Christina Marie Gilbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl T. Anderson
Represented By: John Dress Gehlhausen
Represented By: David MacDonald Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Davies
Represented By: John Dress Gehlhausen
Represented By: George E. McLaughlin
Represented By: David MacDonald Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?