Moran v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Mary Moran
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01518
Filed: June 12, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintff's [sic] Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Home Depot's Amended Answer (Doc. No. 15-1). By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/23/12.(mnfsl, )
May 17, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: In light of Defendants' Response indicating that they consent to Plaintiff's proposed amendments pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2), Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint (Doc. No. 29 , filed May 14, 2013) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 29-2). By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/17/13. (alvsl)
July 9, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/9/2013. (ervsl, )
June 18, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2012 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/18/2012. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moran v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Moran
Represented By: William Wayne Muhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Kittredge Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.