Bank of America, National Association v. United States Small Business Administration

Defendant: United States Small Business Administration and George J. Kennedy
Plaintiff: Bank of America, National Association
Case Number: 1:2012cv01532
Filed: June 13, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/31/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three (3) day Bench Trial set for 6/3/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/7/12. (rebsec, )
March 1, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Joint Motion to Briefly Extend Scheduling Order Deadline. Discovery cut-off is extended to and including 3/15/2013. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/1/2013. (klyon, )
March 20, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion To Dismiss Complaint by Defendant United States Small Business Administration; denying 12 Motion to Remand to State Court. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/20/13. (kfinn, )
March 21, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk. Motion To Dismiss Complaint by Defendant United States Small Business Administration 8 is GRANTED; that the plaintiff's Motion for Remand To State Court Pursuant To 28 USC § 1446 12 is DENIED; and that under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1), this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. By Clerk on 3/21/13. (kfinn, )
June 19, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/19/12. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, National Association v. United States Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Small Business Administration
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George J. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Hilary A. Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Joseph Notarianni
Represented By: Alan David Sweetbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.