Xiong v. Knight Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pahoua Xiong
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc. and Bruce Thompson
Thirdparty_defendant: Excalibur Recovery Services, Inc., Bristol West Insurance Company and Colorado-BW Insurance Agency, Inc.
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Knight Transportation, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Knight Transportation, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Pahoua Xiong
Case Number: 1:2012cv01546
Filed: June 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 JUDGMENT in favor of Pahoua Xiong against Knight Transportation, Inc. re: 102 Order on Motion for Judgment, Order on Motion for New Trial, by Clerk on 12/29/2014. (tscha, )
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER RE: DEPOSITION TESTIMONY by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/15/14. (jdyne, )
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re 40 unopposed motion to amend scheduling order. The new discovery cut-off deadline in this matter is May 23, 2014, and Second Amended Scheduling Order is accepted as filed. IT IS FUTHER ORDERED that the trial scheduled June 23, 2014 has been extended by two additional days for a total of 5 days. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/26/2014. (trlee, )
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Amend scheduling order, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/1/2013.(trlee, )
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 oRDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a three-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on June 23, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for May 21, 2014 at 8:00 a.m. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 05/15/2013. (rbjsec. )
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. 23 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Counterclaims and Third Party Claims Only is granted. The Court specifies that the dismissal, with prejudice, only applies to the Counterclaim of Knight Transportation against Pahoua Xiong; a nd, the Third Party Claims of Knight Transportation against Bristol West Insurance Company, Colorado-BW Insurance Agency, Inc., and Excalibur Recovery Services, Inc. Further the Court states that this dismissal shall have no effect on Plaintiff Pahoua Xiong's claims against Defendant Knight Transportation; and that each party to this Stipulation pay her/its own fees and costs incurred to date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/14/13. (alvsl)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 06/18/2012. (rbjsec. )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiong v. Knight Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Excalibur Recovery Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Bristol West Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Colorado-BW Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Knight Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Paul E. Collins
Represented By: Daniel Sean Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Sean Smith
Represented By: Paul E. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pahoua Xiong
Represented By: Mark Andrew Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Knight Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Sean Smith
Represented By: Paul E. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Pahoua Xiong
Represented By: Mark Andrew Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?