Maines Paper & Food Service, Inc. . v. Savier, et al
Plaintiff: Maines Paper & Food Service, Inc.
Defendant: William Savier and Meadowbrook Meat Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv01773
Filed: July 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER of Dismissal. The Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice [# 27 ] is APPROVED. The combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set 8/9/2013, are VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 8/26/2013, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/9/2013. (klyon, )
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/22/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 5/23/2013. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/8/13. (kfinn, )
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/21/13. (bnbcd, )
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/5/12. (bnbcd, )
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/9/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 8/26/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/11/12. (rebsec, )
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, scheduling order to be submitted by 10/4/12. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/12/12. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maines Paper & Food Service, Inc. . v. Savier, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maines Paper & Food Service, Inc.
Represented By: Bradford J. Williams
Represented By: Steven M. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Savier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadowbrook Meat Company, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Arthur Fredrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?