Saiz v. Astrue
Plaintiff: June Saiz
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv01816
Filed: July 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re: EAJA fees. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/7/2014. (trlee, )
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JUDGMENT by Clerk : This case is REMANDED to the Commissioner for proceedings consistent with the October 8, 2013 Order. by Clerk on 10/8/2013. (trlee, )
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 12/26/2012. SS Defendants Brief due by 1/25/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 2/11/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 11/16/12. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saiz v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Saiz
Represented By: Michael Alan Desaulniers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?