In re: Vickery

In_re: Terry Kenneth Vickery
Defendant: Terry Kenneth Vickery
Plaintiff: Richard K. Diamond
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado and U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 1:2012cv01891
Filed: July 20, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Richard K. Diamond against Terry Kenneth Vickery re: 41 Order. Civil Case Terminated. by Clerk on 1/28/15. (pglov)
January 26, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming the judgment and determination of the Bankruptcy Court. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/26/15. (pglov)
October 29, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Within 21 days the parties shall either 1) file supplemental briefs addressing how the doctrine of collateral estoppel may apply with regard to the previous judgment and each of its component parts (i.e., each of the specific findings made by the jury including punitive damages); or 2) designate their briefs filed on summary judgment in the Bankruptcy Court as part of the record on appeal. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/29/14. (msksec, )
February 14, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Staying and Administratively Closing Case by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/14/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Vickery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In_re: Terry Kenneth Vickery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Kenneth Vickery
Represented By: John Gustaf Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard K. Diamond
Represented By: Ruba M. Forno
Represented By: Steven William Kelly
Represented By: Joe L. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?