Karsten v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Brian Ray Karsten
Defendant: Amber L. Nelson, Blake R. Davis and P.A. Camacho
Case Number: 1:2012cv02107
Filed: August 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Directing Clerk to Open New Civil Action. In accordance with the foregoing, the Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to open a new civil action and file the tendered Amended Prisoner Complaint (ECF No. 34 ) and a copy of thisorder in the new civil action. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 06/21/13. (alvsl)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 32 Motion for Reconsideration. This matter was dismissed "without prejudice." That means Plaintiff is free to re-file a complaint without seeking further judicial permission, either from this Court or from the Court of Appeals. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 06/10/13. (alvsl)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING APRIL 26, 2013 RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE, GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS, AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR THE COURT TO SET TIME LIMITS AND PROVIDE FORMS. The Magistrate Judge's Recommendation 26 is ADOPTED in its entirety and the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion for the Court to Set a Time Limit and Provide Forms 28 is DENIED, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/15/2013. (wjmcd, )
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/27/12. (nmmsl, )
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 08/10/12. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karsten v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber L. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A. Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Ray Karsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?