Mesquida v. Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P.
Plaintiff: Marcel Mesquida
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2012cv02245
Filed: August 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Pursuant to the 36 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice, this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/9/2014. (eseam)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Claim for Relief. The Court dismisses with prejudice Plaintiff's First Claim for Relief, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/25/2013. (eseam)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed scheduling order due by 5/31/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/6/13. (bnbcd, )
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Response Opposing Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Claim for Relief. The tendered Amended Response is accepted for filing, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/4/2013. (eseam)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The Second Amended Complaint with exhibits are accepted for filing, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/15/2013. (eseam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mesquida v. Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain/Southwest, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcel Mesquida
Represented By: Eric V. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?