Lopez v. Kindt et al

Plaintiff: Leonard E. Lopez
Defendant: Glenn W. Kindt and Samuel Waller
Case Number: 1:2012cv02259
Filed: August 24, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS entered by Senior Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/25/15. (rkeec)
May 18, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 84 Plaintiff's Motion for Additional Findings Regarding His Negligent Credentialing Claim, to Amend or Alter Judgment on That Claim, and for New Trial, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/18/15. (ktera)
March 6, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION The conclusion is that the plaintiff has failed to prove his claims by a preponderance of the evidence. It is ORDERED, that judgment shall enter for the defendant, United States of America, dismissing the plaintiffs claims and this civil action with an award of costs. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/6/15. (evana, )
October 21, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing for 1/9/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A re (trial testimony of Dr. Barolat) 45 / 50 , before Judge Richard P. Matsch. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/21/2014. (jsmit )
October 14, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2014 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Counsel to confer and then inform the Court whether Dr. Barolat is available to testify in court December 22, 2014 or other available date. Plaintiff's Motion for Preservation Deposition of Giamcarlo Barolat, M.D. 47 , is moot. FTR: K. Terasaki. (jsmit)
August 28, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Bench Trial for 12/15/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/28/2014. (jsmit)
July 9, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 8/28/2014 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/21/2014 in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on August 21, 2014, lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/9/2014. (jsmit)
February 19, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 2/19/2014 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiff's permitted to take depositions of nurses on what they observed and reported. Defendant shall provide applicable "Minutes" as described on record. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 34 , is granted in part and denied in part as stated on record. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd)
August 12, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Stipulation for Dismissal of All Claims Against Defendant Glenn W. Kindt M.D. With Prejudice by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 08/12/13. (jjhsl, )
July 11, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 25 Motion to Amend 1 Complaint : the [25-4] First Amended Complaint attached thereto is accepted for filing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/11/2013.(rpmcd )
May 23, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Discovery Ruling: the Court is in agreement with the government's response 21 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/23/2013.(rpmcd)
November 13, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/18/2013 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on January 10, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/13/2012. (rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Kindt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard E. Lopez
Represented By: Natalie A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn W. Kindt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?