Brancato et al v. Panio et al
Plaintiff: Robert (I) Brancato, Robert Brancato and Rochelle Brancato
Defendant: Adolescent and Family Institute of Colorado, Inc., Edra Weiss, Carol Olson, Whitney Harrah, Scott Juarez, Jane Jordan, Alexander Panio, Jr. and Mary Panio
Case Number: 1:2012cv02338
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/2/2014. (jsmit)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STAY ORDER: all proceedings in this matter are stayed until further order of the Court, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/22/2013. (rpmcd)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/22/2013 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on November 14, 2013 and lead counsel present. Initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/5/2013. (rpmcd)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Denying DEFENDANTS' RULE 12(c) Motion, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/30/2013 re 99 and 100 .(rpmcd)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER re 106 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 41(a)(2) (Carol Olson): Defendant Carol Olson is dismissed with prejudice from the above captioned case, with each party to pay their own attorney fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/19/2013. (rpmcd)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE HEGARTY re 101 : the order of reference to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty is vacated 10 and the Scheduling Order 67 entered on January 7, 2013, is vacated, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/15/2013.(rpmcd)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER granting 81 Plaintiffs' unopposed Second Amended Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/26/2013.(klyon, )
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 78 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/19/2013. (mehcd)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 75 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/18/2013. (mehcd)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Dismissing Claims re: 58 Stipulation of Dismissal of Party filed by Edra Weiss. All claims asserted by and between Plaintiffs and Defendant Edra Weiss, M.D. are hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to pay his, her or its own attorney fees. All future captions shall omit Edra Weiss, M.D. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/9/2013. (klyon, )
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/8/13. (msksec, )
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER. Scheduling Conference currently set for 1/7/2013 at 9:30 AM will now commence at 9:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/3/2013. (klyon, )
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion to Vacate and Continue December 14, 2012 Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference reset for 1/7/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/6/2012. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brancato et al v. Panio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adolescent and Family Institute of Colorado, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edra Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Olson
Represented By: Christopher Phillips Brown
Represented By: Barbara Hruby Glogiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Harrah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Panio, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Panio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert (I) Brancato
Represented By: Jordana Griff Gingrass
Represented By: Jerome Mark Reinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brancato
Represented By: Jerome Mark Reinan
Represented By: Jordana Griff Gingrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Brancato
Represented By: Jerome Mark Reinan
Represented By: Jordana Griff Gingrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?