Roe v. Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Kelly Roe
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2012cv02344
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 73 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 74 Motion for Costs. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/16/2014.(athom, )
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 JUDGMENT by Clerk. Signed by the Deputy Clerk on 1/24/2014. (cmacd)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Adopting and Affirming 64 Report and Recommendations by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/22/14. Plaintiff's objections 65 are overruled, 50 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss is granted, and 38 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. This case is dismissed with prejudice. (dkals, )
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 66 Motion to Stay the January 13, 2014 Trial Date, the January 13, 2014 Trial Preparation Conference, and All Pre-Trial Deadlines by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/6/14. The Final Trial Preparation Conference and Jury Trial are vacated.(dkals, )
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER denying 52 Motion to Exclude Evidence, to Strike All References Thereto Offered in Support of Defendant's Omnibus Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss, and In Limine by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/16/13.(dkals, )
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Scheduling Conference held on 2/11/2013. On or before 2/15/2013, Plaintiff shall file a THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT which sets forth all Causes of Action which Plaintiff wishes to pursue. Parties indicate they wish to Consent to Magistrate Judge and shall file the proper form on or before 2/15/2013. Plaintiff's oral motion to withdraw Motion to Compel is granted;Plaintiff's Motion to Compe l Defendant to Make the Initial Disclosures Required by Rule 26(a)(1) 28 is withdrawn. Discovery due by 8/12/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 9/12/2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/5/2013., Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Parties shall file Scheduling Order in its final form for the Court's signature on or before 3/8/2013 nunc pro tunc to 2/11/2013. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. (mjwcd)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/1/2012. Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUCTIVE RELIEF 16 is accepted for filing as of 11/1/2012 and is the operative pleading. Defendant's answer due 11/21/2012. Withdrawing 13 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Deadline to file proposed Scheduling Order 12/12/2012. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. (mjwcd)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER denying as premature 2 Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/27/12.(dkals, )
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Status Conference for Pro Se Plaintiff(s) set for 10/18/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/18/2012. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?