Harper et al v. Montezuma County Board of Commissioners et al
Plaintiff: Marion Harper and Montgomery Coyote
Defendant: Montezuma County Board of Commissioners, Sheriff Department, City of Cortez, Cortez Police Dept., 22nd Judicial District and Angelo Martinez
Case Number: 1:2012cv02429
Filed: September 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Adopting and Affirming 80 Report and Recommendations by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/28/13. 59 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. (dkals, )
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Adopting and Affirming 53 Report and Recommendations by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/9/13. 57 Objection is overruled, 44 Motion is granted, and the claims against Defendants Wasley, Lawrence, Walker, Plewe, the Montezuma County Sheriffs Department, the Montezuma County Board of Commissioners, and the Cortez Police Department are dismissed without prejudice.(dkals, )
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER to Amend Caption pursuant to 43 Amended Complaint by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/23/13. (dkals, )
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 36 Joint Motion to Strike and striking 33 Amended Complaint. Motions to Dismiss 7 and 26 are granted, and 3 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. 31 Motion to Quash is denied as moot. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/9/13.(dkals, )
January 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference and vacating the 1/15/13 Scheduling Conference. 14 Letter is denied as moot without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/6/13.(dkals, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper et al v. Montezuma County Board of Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montgomery Coyote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montezuma County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Michael Edward McLachlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Department
Represented By: Michael Edward McLachlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cortez
Represented By: Jennifer Fawn Kemp
Represented By: Gillian Marie Fahlsing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortez Police Dept.
Represented By: Gillian Marie Fahlsing
Represented By: Jennifer Fawn Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 22nd Judicial District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelo Martinez
Represented By: Gillian Marie Fahlsing
Represented By: Jennifer Fawn Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?