Knudsen v. Woodward, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dana Knudsen
Defendant: Woodward, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv02467
Filed: September 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/23/2013. (rpmcd)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Amend Complaint by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 03/12/13.(jjhsl, )
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/2/2013 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 28, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/25/2013. (rpmcd )
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING THIRD CLAIM FOR RELIEF re 6 : the third claim for relief in the complaint is dismissed under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and the remainder of the defendant's motion to dismiss is disregarded because it addresses a claim not pleaded, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/28/2012.(rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knudsen v. Woodward, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Knudsen
Represented By: Phillip L. Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodward, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis D. Herms, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?