Swan v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Benjamin W. Swan
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv02529
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER on 22 Plaintiffs Motion for an Award of Attorney's fees. Plaintiff's attorney shall be entitled to receive, from Plaintiffs past due benefits, after subtraction for EAJA fees paid, an additional amount of $20,314.50 under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) for representation in this Court. Entered by Judge John L. Kane on 11/12/2015.(agarc, )
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Attorney Fees, by Judge John L. Kane on 4/10/13.(sgrim)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINAL JUDGMENT re: 18 Order on Motion to Remand to Agency, by Clerk on 3/15/13. (sgrim)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Remand. This civil action is remanded to Defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), by Judge John L. Kane on 3/14/13.(sgrim)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiff's Brief due by 2/4/2013. SS Defendant's Brief due by 3/6/2013. SS Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 3/20/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 12/19/12. (lygsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swan v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin W. Swan
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?