Reynolds v. Director(s), Colorado Department Of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Johnny L. Reynolds
Defendant: Director(s), Colorado Department Of Corrections, Warden(s), Limon Correctional Facility, Michael Lind, Cordova, Joni Corcoran, Gisela Walker, Anthony DeCesaro and John Reilly
Case Number: 1:2012cv02558
Filed: September 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/3/15. ORDERED: The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 59 is ACCEPTED in part. ORDERED: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 44 is GRANTED. ORDERED: Plaintiff Johnny L. Reynolds' Motions for Summary Judgment [56, 73, 74] are DENIED as moot. ORDERED: Plaintiff Johnny L. Reynolds' Motions for Status [70 and 72] are DENIED as moot. ORDERED: Within 14 days of the entry of judgment, defendants may havetheir costs by filing a bill of costs with the Clerk of the Court. ORDERED: that this case is dismissed in its entirety.(kpreu)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 Motion to Set Aside. ORDERED that the Order Accepting Magistrate Judges Recommendation 60 and the Final Judgment [Docket No. 61] are VACATED and this case is reopened. Plaintiff shall file objections to the Recommendation on or before Monday, April 21, 2014 by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 04/01/14.(jhawk, )
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya [Docket No. 59] is ACCEPTED. ORDERED that defendants Motion to Dismiss [Docket No. 44] is GRANTED. ORDERED that judgment shall enter in favor of defendants DIRECTOR, COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS; MICHAEL LIND; CORDOVA, LIEUTENANT #3191; JONI CORCORAN; and JOHN REILLY and against plaintiff JOHNNY L. REYNOLDS. ORDERED that the Defendants are AWARDED their costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1 by Clerk on 03/14/14. (jhawk, )
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Accepting Magistrate Judge's Recommendation. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 59 is ACCEPTED. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 44 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to USCS Fed. R. Civ. Proc. R. 56(b) 56 is DENIED AS MOOT. This case and the claims contained therein are dismissed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/12/14.(jhawk, ) (Main Document 60 replaced on 3/13/2014) (jhawk, ). Modified on 3/13/2014 to add the correct PDF (jhawk, ).
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 41 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/15/13.(mnfsl, )
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to a District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that Defendants Director of the CDOC, the Warden of the Limon Correctional Facility, P.A. Giesla Walker, and Grievance Officer Anthony DeCesaro are D ISMISSED from this action. The claims of unconstitutional retaliation against Defendants Joni Corcoran, Lt. Cordova, Michael Lind, and John Reilly, and the Title II ADA claim against the Defendant Director of the CDOC in his official capacity, wh ich is construed as a claim against the CDOC, shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. Plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment 4 and 11 are denied as premature. All other pending motions, 6 , 28 , and 30 , are denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/6/13.(sgrim)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Second and Final ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/27/2012. (sks)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/26/12 GRANTING 18 Motion for Extension of Time ; and DENYING 18 Motion for Protective Order.Plaintiff shall file his second amended complaint in compliance with the directives in the Courts November 6, 2012 Order on or before January 21, 2012. No further extensions will be granted absent a showing of just cause. A motion for extension of time filed more than two weeks before the deadline will not be considered. Plaintiffs second request for order of protection is denied for the reasons set forth in the November 16, 2012 Order Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief (ECF No. 17).(nmmsl, )
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief. ORDERED that the Request for Immediate Order of Protection and Motion for Amendment of Prisoner Complaint 16 is DENIED to the extent Mr. Reynolds' requests preliminary injunctive relie f. Plaintiff's request to file an amended complaint is granted as follows: Mr. Reynolds shall file a second amended complaint, in compliance with the directives in the November 6, 2012 Order, and in accordance with this Order, on or before December 20, 2012, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/16/12.(sgrim)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/06/2012. (skssl, )
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/11/12. (nmmsl, )
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/27/12. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Director(s), Colorado Department Of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny L. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director(s), Colorado Department Of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden(s), Limon Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joni Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gisela Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony DeCesaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?