Perito v. Commissioner of Social Security, et al
Plaintiff: David Anthony Perito
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and US. Social Security Administration
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2012cv02567
Filed: September 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Approval of Attorney Fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). In accordance therewith, it is ORDERED that Defendant shall pay to Plaintiff reasonable attorney fees in the amount of $2,990.00, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/29/2015.(evana, )
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 the Stipulated Motion for an Award of Attorney Fees, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/3/2014.(evana, )
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that this case is REVERSED AND REMANDED to the Commissioner for further fact finding as directed in this Order pursuant to sentence four in 42 U.S.C.§ 405(g), by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/18/2013. (ervsl, )
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint Case Management Plan. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 2/25/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 3/27/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 4/11/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 1/16/13. (sgrim)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Drawing Case. ORDERED that this case shall be placed on the AP docket, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/1/12. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perito v. Commissioner of Social Security, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Anthony Perito
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Whitcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?