MacIntyre v. JP Morgan Chase Bank,NA, et al
Plaintiff: Holly MacIntyre
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp. and Fannie Mae
Case Number: 1:2012cv02586
Filed: September 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT re: 138 , by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/20/2015. (dhans, )
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 59(e), or Alternatively to Certify Issues for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1291. The Court's Order Adoptin g the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge and Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 126 ) is VACATED. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (ECF No. 117 ) is ADOPTED IN PART as to the Colorado River doctrine and REJECTED I N PART as to the Younger abstention doctrine. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 110 ) is GRANTED. An amended judgment against Plaintiff and in favor of Defendant shall issue. Defendant shall have its costs. By Judge William J. Martinez on 3/19/2015. (alowe)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER The Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge ECF No. 117 is ADOPTED; Plaintiffs Objections to the Recommendation ECF No. 118 are OVERRULED; Defendants Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint ECF No. 110 is GRANTED; and Plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of jurisdiction, and the Clerk shall enter judgment against Plaintiff and in favor of Defendant. The parties shall bear their own costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/31/2014.(evana, )
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 123 Plaintiffs Motion to Restrain and Enjoin Proceedings in Jefferson County District Court, Pursuant to the All Writs Act, 28 U.S.C. § 1651(a), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/25/2014.(evana, )
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER For the reasons set forth, the Court affirms Judge Hegartys Recommendation in part ECF No. 79 and ORDERS as follows: The Court DENIES Defendants Motion to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE ECF No. 39 and GRANTS leave to re-file; Plaintiffs Objec tion ECF No. 81 is OVERRULED to the extent that it seeks that this Court maintain jurisdiction over this matter without further review; Judge Hegarty to schedule a Status Conference before any further motions are filed in this matter consistent w ith the instructions stated in this Order; That Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendant's Response ECF No. 91 is DENIED; That Plaintiff be GRANTED leave to re-file an amended complaint by no later than 10 days after the date of the Status Conference before Judge Hegarty, by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/11/2013.(ervsl, )
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER denying 64 Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/18/2013.(ervsl, )
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Plaintiff's Stipulated Motion to Vacate and Reset the Scheduling Conference Set for November 30, 2012. Scheduling Conference reset for 1/24/2013 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/21/2012. (mehcd)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting 14 the Bank Defendants' Motion for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e). Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint to correct the defects and make Defendants' suggested changes on or before 10/22/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/15/2012. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacIntyre v. JP Morgan Chase Bank,NA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly MacIntyre
Represented By: John William Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Kelly Sue Kilgore
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Kelly Sue Kilgore
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp.
Represented By: Kelly Sue Kilgore
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae
Represented By: Kelly Sue Kilgore
Represented By: Mark Cameron Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?