Endrew F. v. Douglas County School District RE-1
Plaintiff: Jennifer F., Joseph F. and Endrew F.
Defendant: Douglas County School District RE-1
Amicus Curiae: Maria R. Coor
Case Number: 1:2012cv02620
Filed: October 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: Pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice #78 , this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/8/2018. (ebuch)
May 7, 2018 Filing 78 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Robinson, Jack)
April 19, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F. (Robinson, Jack)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER of USCA as to #71 Notice of Appeal filed by Douglas County School District RE-1. "Because the district court has not yet entered a final decision in this matter, this court lacks jurisdiction to consider this appeal. Endrew F.s motion to dismiss is granted and this appeal is DISMISSED" (USCA Case No. 18-1089) (angar, )
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER granting #74 Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time to File Brief and Accounting of Monetary Award, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/3/2018. (ebuch)
April 2, 2018 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief and Accounting of Monetary Award by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Robinson, Jack)
March 15, 2018 Filing 73 USCA Case Number 18-1089 for #71 Notice of Appeal filed by Douglas County School District RE-1. (angar, )
March 14, 2018 Filing 72 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #71 Notice of Appeal filed by Douglas County School District RE-1 to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(angar, ) (angar, ). Modified on 3/15/2018 to correct document (angar, ).
March 14, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #66 Memorandum & Opinion, by Defendant Douglas County School District RE-1 (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number 1082-5993237) (Jacobs, Wendy)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER granting #69 Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief and Accounting of Monetary Award, up to and including April 6, 2018, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/21/2018. (ebuch)
February 20, 2018 Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief and Accounting of Monetary Award by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Robinson, Jack)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/14/2018. Pursuant to the Order of Reference filed by the Honorable Lewis T. Babcock on 2/13/2018 [ECF No. 67], counsel for the parties shall first teleconference together, then call my Chambers at (303) 844-4507 if they wish to schedule a settlement conference in this case. (mdave, )
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/13/2018. (angar, )
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER reversing the Administrative Court Agency Decision denying Petitioner and his parents' request for reimbursement of his tuition and transportation costs to attend school at Firefly. It is ordered that Petitioner and his parents are entitled to reimbursement of their private school placement from the District as well as reasonable attorneys' fees and litigation costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/12/2018. (ebuch)
February 7, 2018 Filing 65 COURTROOM MINUTES for Oral Argument Hearing held before Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/7/2018. This matter is taken under advisement. A written order shall issue. Court Reporter: Julie Thomas. (ebuch)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER granting #63 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys of Record. William E. Trachman and Robert Sherman Ross are allowed to withdraw as counsel for Respondent herein, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/18/2017. (ebuch)
December 15, 2017 Filing 63 First MOTION to Withdraw As Attorneys of Record by Defendant Douglas County School District RE-1. (Trachman, William)
December 7, 2017 Filing 62 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT Petitioner's Submission of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Robinson, Jack)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part #58 Respondent's Opposed Request for Hearing. Oral Argument set for 2/7/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom C401 before Judge Lewis T. Babcock, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/5/2017. (ebuch)
November 30, 2017 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to #58 MOTION for Order to Hold Hearing/Oral Argument filed by Defendant Douglas County School District RE-1. (Jacobs, Wendy)
November 29, 2017 Filing 59 RESPONSE to Request for Hearing by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Robinson, Jack)
November 28, 2017 Filing 58 MOTION for Order to Hold Hearing/Oral Argument by Defendant Douglas County School District RE-1. (Jacobs, Wendy)
November 22, 2017 Filing 57 REPLY Petitioner's Reply Brief On Remand by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Robinson, Jack)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying #47 Motion of Former Officials of the U.S. Department of Education, The Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, The National Down Syndrome Congress, The Autistic Self Advocacy Network, The ARC of the United States, and The ARC of Colorado, To Participate as Amicus Curiae in Support of Petitioner, Endrew F., by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/16/2017. (ebuch)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER granting #53 Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief, up to and including 11/22/2017, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/14/2017. (ebuch)
November 13, 2017 Filing 54 REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S COMBINED PARTIAL OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO PARTICIPATE AS AMICUS CURIAE AND AMICUS BRIEF SUBMITTED THEREWITH by Amicus Maria R. Coor. (Coor, Maria)
November 13, 2017 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Petitioner's Reply Brief by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Robinson, Jack)
November 2, 2017 Filing 52 RESPONSE To Petitioners' Brief (Docket No. 46) by Defendant Douglas County School District RE-1. (Attachments: #1 Petitioners' Appellate Supplemental Reply Brief, #2 Petitioners' Appellate Supplemental Opening Brief)(Trachman, William)
October 27, 2017 Filing 51 BRIEF in Opposition to #47 Third Party MOTION to File Amicus Brief On behalf of Former Officials of the U.S. Department of Education, THe Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, The National Down Syndrome Congress, the Autistic Self Advocacy Network, The Arc of and Response to Brief filed by Defendant Douglas County School District RE-1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter, #2 Exhibit Appellate Brief, #3 Exhibit Letter)(Trachman, William)
October 11, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Edward Trachman on behalf of Douglas County School District RE-1Attorney William Edward Trachman added to party Douglas County School District RE-1(pty:dft) (Trachman, William)
October 11, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Wendy Jacobs on behalf of Douglas County School District RE-1Attorney Wendy Jacobs added to party Douglas County School District RE-1(pty:dft) (Jacobs, Wendy)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER. A Motion of Former Officials of the U.S. Department of Education, The Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, The National Down Syndrome Congress, The Autistic Self Advocacy Network, The ARC of the United States, and the ARC of Colorado, to Participate as Amicus Curiae in Support of Petitioner, Endrew F. (Doc #47 - filed October 5, 2017) has been filed. The parties have up to and including October 27, 2017 to file a response. A reply is due on or before November 13, 2017, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/06/2017. (angar, )
October 5, 2017 Filing 47 Third Party MOTION to File Amicus Brief On behalf of Former Officials of the U.S. Department of Education, THe Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, The National Down Syndrome Congress, the Autistic Self Advocacy Network, The Arc of the United States, and The Arc of Colorado in Support of Petitioner by Amicus Maria R. Coor. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Curiae Brief of Former Officials of the U.S. Department of Education, The Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, The National Down Syndrome Congress, the Austistic Self Advocacy Network, The Arc of the United States, and the Arc of Colorado)(Coor, Maria)
October 5, 2017 Filing 46 BRIEF on Remand by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Robinson, Jack)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER. Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Doc #44 - filed September 11, 2017) is GRANTED. Petitioner has up to and including October 5, 2017 to file his Opening Brief. Respondent has up to and including November 2, 2017 to file its Response Brief, and Petitioner has up to and including November 16, 2017 to file a Reply Brief, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 09/12/2017. (angar, )
September 11, 2017 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Petitioner's Opening Brief by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Robinson, Jack)
September 5, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Stuart Stuller on behalf of Douglas County School District RE-1Attorney William Stuart Stuller added to party Douglas County School District RE-1(pty:dft) (Stuller, William)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Petitioners shall file a brief addressing its claim that Respondent substantively violated the IDEA under the standard now articulated by the Supreme Court in this case by 9/21/2017. Respondent shall file a response brief by 10/5/2017. Petitioners may file a reply brief by 10/19/2017, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/31/2017. (ebuch)
August 24, 2017 Filing 41 MANDATE of USCA as to #31 Notice of Appeal filed by Joseph F., Jennifer F., Endrew F. : (USCA Case No. 14-1417) (angar, )
August 2, 2017 Filing 40 USCA Order and Judgment as to #31 Notice of Appeal filed by Joseph F., Jennifer F., Endrew F. : (USCA Case No. 14-1417) (This document is not the Mandate) (angar, )
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF USCA ENTERED: Recalling the mandate as to Notice of Appeal #31 filed by Plaintiff Joseph F., Plaintiff Jennifer F., Plaintiff Endrew F. (Appeal No. 14-1417) (The document attached to the docket entry of the Order has been blocked from access in CM pursuant to this recall of mandate) (agarc, )
September 29, 2016 Filing 38 Letter from the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals that the petition for a writ of certiorari is Granted. Assigned Supreme Court Number 15-827 (Appeal Number 14-1417) (evana, )
October 2, 2015 Filing 37 RECALLED - MANDATE of USCA as to #31 Notice of Appeal filed by Joseph F., Jennifer F., Endrew F. (USCA Case No. 14-1417) (dkals, ) Modified to recall the mandate pursuant to #39 USCA Order on 4/24/2017 (agarc, ).
August 25, 2015 Filing 36 VACATED - USCA Judgment as to #31 Notice of Appeal filed by Joseph F., Jennifer F., Endrew F.: the judgment of the district court is affirmed. (USCA Case No. 14-1417) (This document is not the Mandate) (dkals, ) Modified to vacate pursuant to #39 USCA Order on 4/24/2017 (agarc, ). Modified on 4/25/2017 to restrict this document as mandate had been recalled by the U.S. Court of Appeals (agarc, ).
October 21, 2014 Filing 35 LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to #31 Notice of Appeal filed by Joseph F., Jennifer F., Endrew F. A transcript order form was filed stating that a transcript is not necessary. ( Appeal No. 14-1417) Text Only Entry (dkals, )
October 20, 2014 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F. Transcript is not necessary re #31 Notice of Appeal. (dkals, )
October 9, 2014 Filing 33 USCA Case Number 14-1417 for #31 Notice of Appeal filed by Joseph F., Jennifer F., Endrew F. (dkals, )
October 9, 2014 Filing 32 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #31 Notice of Appeal filed by Joseph F., Jennifer F., Endrew F. to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(dkals, )
October 9, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #29 Order, #30 Clerk's Judgment by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F. (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number 1082-4085024) (Robinson, Jack)
September 15, 2014 Filing 30 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Douglas County School District RE-1 against Endrew F., Jennifer F., and Joseph F. pursuant to #29 Order, by Clerk on 9/15/2014. (eseam)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER affirming the Administrative Court Agency Decision, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/15/2014. (eseam)
May 24, 2013 Filing 28 CASE REASSIGNED Your AP case is at issue. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1 this case is assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 12-cv-02620-LTB. Text Only Entry (mnfsl, )
May 14, 2013 Filing 27 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF re #15 Administrative Record by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Robinson, Jack) Modified on 5/14/2013 to correct text (jjhsl, ).
May 13, 2013 Filing 26 BRIEF re #22 Administrative Record - Plaintiffs Opening Brief Reply by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Robinson, Jack)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER. Respondent's Motion to Accept Late Filing #23 is GRANTED. The Court accepts the Response filed at #24 . Petitioner has up to and including May 13, 2013 to file a Reply Brief, by Judge John L. Kane on 4/30/13. Text Only Entry.(sgrim)
April 30, 2013 Filing 24 DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE BRIEF re #15 Administrative Record by Defendant Douglas County School District RE-1. (Ross, Robert)
April 30, 2013 Filing 23 MOTION for Order to Accept Late Filing of Reply Brief by Defendant Douglas County School District RE-1. (Ross, Robert)
March 25, 2013 Filing 22 PLAINTIFF'S OPENING BRIEF re #15 Administrative Record by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Robinson, Jack)
March 22, 2013 Filing 21 BRIEF Opening Brief by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Robinson, Jack) Modified on 3/25/2013 as counsel has been directed to refile. (sgrim)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute ORDER granting #19 Petitioner's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. Petitioner has up to and including March 22, 2013 to file an Opening Brief, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/15/13. Text Only Entry(lygsl, )
March 15, 2013 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Robinson, Jack)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 The Unopposed Motion to Supplement. The Administrative Record is SUPPLEMENTED by substitution of a complete copy of the pleadings filed with the Office of Administrative Courts for the pleadings previously submitted in Binder One of Three of the Administrative Record (Doc. 15), by Judge John L. Kane on 01/29/13. Text Only Entry(jlksec)
January 28, 2013 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Supplement Administrative Record by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document)(Robinson, Jack)
December 26, 2012 Filing 15 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD COVER PAGE (Text Only Entry - Available in other format at the Clerk's Office) by Defendant Douglas County School District RE-1. (jjhsl, )
December 20, 2012 Filing 16 Joint Case Management Plan for Petitions for Review of Agency Action. Adm Plaintiffs Brief due by 3/15/2013. Adm Defendants Brief due by 4/15/2013. Adm Plaintiff Reply Brief due by 4/30/2013, by Judge John L. Kane on 12/20/12. (sgrim)
December 18, 2012 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order Joint Case Management Plan for Petitions for Review of Agency Action by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Robinson, Jack)
November 30, 2012 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Douglas County School District RE-1.(Ross, Robert)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER Re Joint Case Management Plan, by Judge John L. Kane on 11/29/12. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (rpmcd)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion to Reassign Case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign this case to the AP docket. The Scheduling Conference currently set before this Court on December 18, 2012, is vacated by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/20/12.(jjhsl, ) Modified on 11/29/2012 (jjhsl, ).
November 20, 2012 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM regarding #9 Unopposed MOTION to Reassign Case to AP Docket filed by Joseph F., Jennifer F., Endrew F.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge David M. Ebel on 11/20/12. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
November 19, 2012 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Reassign Case to AP Docket by Plaintiffs Endrew F., Jennifer F., Joseph F.. (Robinson, Jack)
November 1, 2012 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph F., Jennifer F., Endrew F.. Douglas County School District RE-1 waiver sent on 10/30/2012, answer due 12/31/2012. (Robinson, Jack)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2012 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/16/2012. (mehcd, )
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge David M. Ebel on 10/4/12. (lygsl, )
October 3, 2012 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #4 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is reassigned to Judge David M. Ebel. All future pleadings should be designated as 12-cv-02620-DME-MEH. Text Only Entry. (sgrim)
October 3, 2012 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by Judge John L. Kane. (sgrim)
October 3, 2012 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. (dbera, )
October 2, 2012 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge John L. Kane and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
October 2, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas County School District RE-1 (Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 1082-3045989), filed by Endrew F. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endrew F. v. Douglas County School District RE-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer F.
Represented By: Jack David Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph F.
Represented By: Jack David Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endrew F.
Represented By: Jack David Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maria R. Coor
Represented By: Maria Rachel Coor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County School District RE-1
Represented By: Robert Sherman Ross
Represented By: W. Stuart Stuller
Represented By: Wendy Jacobs
Represented By: William Edward Trachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?