HR BRIARGATE, LLC v. Colorado Springs Orthopaedic Association, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: HR Briargate,LLC
Defendant: Colorado Springs Orthopaedic Association, P.C., Colorado Springs Orthopedic Group and Ashley A. Wiechmann
Case Number: 1:2012cv02636
Filed: October 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER accepting and adopting the stipulations contained in 60 Stipulated Petition for Interest, Costs, Expenses and Attorney Fees. The Clerk will prepare a form of Amended Final Judgment consistent with this order. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/9/14. (jdyne, )
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JUDGMENT in favor of HR Briargate,LLC against Colorado Springs Orthopedic Group, by Clerk on 2/5/2014. (trlee, )
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 46 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Defendant's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Trial Preparation Conference and Bench Trial are VACATED. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/4/14.(rbjcd, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PROTECTIVE ORDER. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/20/2013. (trlee, )
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 11 Defendant Ashley A. Wiechman's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's claims against him are dismissed with prejudice. Mr. Wiechman is awarded his costs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d) (1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 09/18/13. (alvsl)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a three-day bench trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on March 10, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation Conference is set for February 7, 2014 at 8:00 a.m. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/11/2013. (rbjsec, )
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/12/2012. (rbjsec. )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HR BRIARGATE, LLC v. Colorado Springs Orthopaedic Association, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HR Briargate,LLC
Represented By: Eric Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Springs Orthopaedic Association, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Springs Orthopedic Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley A. Wiechmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?