Miller v. Kastelic et al
Plaintiff: Larry C. Miller
Defendant: Tom Clements, Corrections Corp. of America, Warden Miller, Captain Kastelic, Daniel Reimer, Ridgwell and Investigator Brownstein
Case Number: 1:2012cv02677
Filed: October 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER on 235 Motion to Dismiss. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/31/2015. (athom, )
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge (Doc. # 213 ) is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 15 of the U.S. District Courts Local Rules, the Court hereby determines that Plaintiff Miller merits appointment of counsel drawn from the Civil Pro Bono Panel. The Clerk shall select, notify, and appoint counsel to represent the unrepresented party in this civil matter. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/02/2015.(athom, )
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Objections to Bill of Costs (Doc. # 202 ) are OVERRULED and his request for a stay of the award of costs is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's request, in the Motion for Court Review of Bill of Costs (Doc. # 207 ), to vacate the award of costs is DENIED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/05/2015. (athom, )
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER denying 201 Motion to Amend. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/18/2014. (athom, )
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 FINAL JUDGMENT re: 185 Order on Report and Recommendations. Signed by Clerk on 06/09/2014. (athom, )
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER ADOPTING AND AFFIRMING 178 APRIL 3, 2014RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: 140 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. This action is REMANDED to the District Court, Fremont County, Colorado, for further proceedings related to Plaintiffs state law claims against Defendant Reimer. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/23/2014.(athom, )
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MINUTE ORDER denying 162 Motion Requesting this Court to Take Judicial Notice of Known Danger of 211 Security Threat Group as set forth by the Colorado Court of Appeals in People v. Davis, 296 P.3d 219 and 163 Motion Requesting Court to Take Judicial Notice of Pending Criminal Assault Charges from 211 Gang Members at Crowley County Correctional Facility by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/29/14.(dkals, )
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE ORDER granting 151 Defendants Kastelic's and Ridgwell's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and striking 143 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/10/2014. (mehcd)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 150 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Previously Filed Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Amende d Response and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, which is liberally construed as a motion to file a surreply. Plaintiff shall file a surreply on or before 1/21/2014. To the extent that the surreply contains new arguments and/or evidence, the Court will entertain a motion from the Defendants requesting leave to respond. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/7/2014. (mehcd)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE ORDER denying 134 Motion for Request of Copy of Oral Deposition Conducted by Defendant's Counsel by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/5/13.(dkals, )
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 120 Motion for Default Judgment Regarding Defendant Daniel Reimer by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/4/13.(dkals, )
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 110 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Reimer's Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 37(a), 34(b), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/26/2013. (mehcd)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER striking the following motions: 102 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Against Lt. Ridgwell and 103 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Against Defendant Captain Kastelic, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/19/2013. (mehcd)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER denying 91 Defendant Kastelic's and Ridgwell's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to their First Set of Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/16/2013. (mehcd)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER granting 92 Defendants Kastelic's and Ridgwell's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/1/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 11/2/2013. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 1/8/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/25/2013. (mehcd)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Discovery. As described above, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to issue and serve a subpoena on CCCF. All other requests for discovery contained in the Motion are inappropriate. Therefore, Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Subpoena of Discovery (filed May 22, 2013; docket # 69 ) is granted in part and denied in part as stated herein. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/25/13. (alvsl)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 76 Plaintiff's Second "Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Claim of Custody of Witnesses," by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/14/2013. (mehcd)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 70 Plaintiff's "Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Claim of Custody of Witnesses," by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/24/2013. (mehcd)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying without prejudice 64 Plaintiff's Motion for Subpoena for Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/7/2013. (mehcd)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Defendant Kastelic's and Ridgwell's Motion to Allow Plaintiff's Deposition Pursuant to C.R.C.P. 30(A)(2)(D), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/30/2013. (mehcd)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER granting 56 Motion to Withdraw and withdrawing 38 Motion to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/24/13.(dkals, )
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 47 Motion to Rectify a Safety Issue Re: Civil Case #1:12-cv-02677-CMA-MEH and 52 Motion to Rectify a Safety Issue Related to Case No. 1:12-cv-02677-CMA-MEH by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/11/13.(dkals, )
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 48 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff [sic] Brownstein: Party Investigator Brownstein terminated by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/9/13.(dkals, )
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER denying 19 Motion for Substitution of Service by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/16/13.(dkals, )
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to a District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that claims eight, nine, and ten in the Prisoner Complaint are dismissed without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants CDOC Executive Director Tom Clements, Corrections Corporation of America, and Warden Miller are dismissed as parties to this action. FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/11/13. (sgrim)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Plaintiff To File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/30/12. (nmmsl, )
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/10/12. (nmmsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Kastelic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry C. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corp. of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Kastelic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ridgwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investigator Brownstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?