Hunter v. City and County of Denver et al
Plaintiff: Jamal Hunter
Defendant: City and County of Denver, Karolina Sich, Mazoni, Rumer, Keller, Karolina (I) Sich, Mazoni (I), Rumer (I) and Keller (I)
Case Number: 1:2012cv02682
Filed: October 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER Approving Settlement Agreement by Judge John L. Kane on 07/25/14. (jhawk, )
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Motion for Additional Sanctions 177 by Judge John L. Kane on 07/22/14.(jhawk, )
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER. The Documents Submitted Yesterday for In Camera Review are ORDERED to be Disclosed by Judge John L. Kane on 07/15/14. (jhawk, )
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 151 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant The City and County of Denver. The Court being fully briefed, hereby GRANTS the withdrawal of Cathy Havener Greer, William T. OConnell III, Stephen E. Baumann II, and Kristin Anderson George of Wells, Anderson & Race, LLC as counsel of record for the Defendant The City and County of Denver by Judge John L. Kane on 06/27/14.(jhawk, )
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting 145 Motion to Modify or Quash the Subpoenas Duces Tecum Served on Sergeants Brian Cotter and Brad Lenderink with Respect to a Statement Regarding Settlement by Judge John L. Kane on 06/23/14.(jhawk, )
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER re: Motion for Reconsideration and Extension of Discovery Cut Off to Complete Inmate Affiant Depositions 127 . The discovery period in which to complete the inmate affiant depositions is hereby extended from June 25, 2014 to July 23, 2014, or as otherwise ordered by Judge John L. Kane on 6/18/14. (jhawk, )
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER. With the exception of birth dates contained in Documents 53-12, 53-13, 55-12, 55-4 and 74-1, the motions to restrict are denied by Judge John L. Kane on 06/12/14. (jhawk, )
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 92 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Depose Prisoner Witnesses Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(a)(2)(B). The scheduling requirements of this civil action necessitate the waiver of the twenty-day deposition notice provision of the Colorado Department of Corrections Administrative Regulation 750-03, and that the scheduling of the depositions should be accomplished as soon as reasonably possible. By Judge John L. Kane on 5/15/2014.(klyon, )
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane on 3/13/2014. ORDERED: Plaintiff shall file AMENDED COMPLAINT by 4/14/2014. Defendants shall file any ANSWER by 5/5/2014, or as otherwise ordered. Proposed SCHEDULING ORD ER due by 6/4/2014, or as otherwise ordered. Denying Without Prejudice 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying Without Prejudice 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying Without Prejudice 42 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 66 Motion for Discovery; Granting 67 Motion to Strike ; Finding as Moot 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; Finding as Moot 69 Motion to Stay. Court Reporter: Mary George. (babia)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Motion to Amend scheduling order: Discovery due by 11/8/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 12/13/2013. by Judge John L. Kane on 10/4/2013.(trlee, )
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Motion Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Period for Limited Depositions and Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline. The discovery cut-off is extended to September 30, 2013 for the limited purposes as set forth in the Parties joint motion, and the dispositive motion deadline is extended to November 4, 2013 by Judge John L. Kane on 07/26/13.(jjhsl, )
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Judge Robert Lewis McGahey on 10/01/2012. (dbera, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. City and County of Denver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Represented By: Cristina Pena Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karolina Sich
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Represented By: Cristina Pena Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazoni
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Represented By: Cristina Pena Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rumer
Represented By: Thomas Sullivan Rice
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller
Represented By: Cristina Pena Helm
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karolina (I) Sich
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazoni (I)
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rumer (I)
Represented By: Thomas Sullivan Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller (I)
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Hunter
Represented By: Siddhartha Hardas Rathod
Represented By: Qusair Mohamedbhai
Represented By: Arash Jahanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?