WM Capital Partners XXX, LLC v. Fish Run, LLC et al
Plaintiff: WM Capital Partners XXX, LLC
Defendant: Fish Run, LLC, Parr Living Trust, The, Thomas H. Parr, Monica M. Parr, Spizzirri Family Tust, The, Marc J. Spizzirri and Candee C. Spizzirri
Case Number: 1:2012cv02753
Filed: October 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/4/2013. (rpmcd )
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/24/2013 11:00 AM in Conference Room before Judge Richard P. Matsch. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 18, 2013 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 03/12/13. (jjhsl, )
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 40 Motion to Compel: the deposition of Defendant Thomas H. Parr will be taken in Denver, Colorado, at a time and place to be agreed upon by counsel, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/7/2013.(rpmcd)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re 37 Motion: the Public Trustee of Routt County is excused from participation in any alternate dispute resolution that may be ordered and trial, and from compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16 and 26, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/30/2013.(rpmcd)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Discovery. ORDERED that the motion 27 is granted and Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' First Set of Request for Production of Documents, First Set of Special Interrogatories and First Set of Request for Admission are due on or before February 1, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/8/13. (rpmcd, )
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF re 24 and 25 : law firm of Holland & Hart LLP and attorneys Christopher James Heaphey and Sean Michael Hanlon are permitted to withdraw as counsel for the plaintiff and the Clerk is directed to terminate their electronic service and Darrel G. Wass, Patricia C. Campbell and the law firm of Waas Campbell Rivera Johnson & Velasquez LLP are substituted as counsel for the plaintiff, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/7/2013. (rpmcd)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying 17 Motion to Transfer Case, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/27/2012.(rpmcd)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/7/2012 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on November 30, 2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/25/2012. (rpmcd )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WM Capital Partners XXX, LLC v. Fish Run, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WM Capital Partners XXX, LLC
Represented By: Christopher James Heaphey
Represented By: Sean Michael Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fish Run, LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parr Living Trust, The
Represented By: Jay B. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas H. Parr
Represented By: Jay B. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica M. Parr
Represented By: Jay B. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spizzirri Family Tust, The
Represented By: Jay B. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc J. Spizzirri
Represented By: Jay B. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candee C. Spizzirri
Represented By: Jay B. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?