National Jewish Health v. WebMD Health Services Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: National Jewish Health
Defendant: WebMD Health Services Group, Inc. and WebMD Health Corp.
Case Number: 1:2012cv02834
Filed: October 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 VACATED MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Fed. R. Evid. 701 Witnesses Based on Specialized Knowledge ECF No. 172 , filed September 15, 2014, and Plaintiffs Motion in Limine Concerning the Controlling Choice of Law ECF No. 173 , by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/17/2014.(evana, ) (Modified on 9/18/2014 Vacated pursuant to the 176 Minute Order)(evana, ).
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held on 7/2/2014 proceedings held before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Denying 92 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Denying 115 Motion to Strike. Denying 126 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Denying 138 Motion to Strike. Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1002 before Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (rkeec)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MINUTE ORDER granting 147 National Jewish Healths, Unopposed Motion To File Motion To Restrict Access, and exhibits 1, 2, and 3 of National Jewish Healths Motion To Strike Evidence Submitted In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Partial Summary Judgment [ECF No. 108] are RESTRICTED at Level 1 Restriction, which limits access to the parties and this Court, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/16/2014.(evana, )
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER that Special Master Hedges Recommendation ECF No. 156 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. As such, it is FURTHER ORDERED that National Jewish Healths Motion For Rule 37 Sanctions ECF No. 72 is DENIED, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/21/2014.(evana, )
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MINUTE ORDER denying 151 Plaintiff National Jewish Health's Opposed Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Pretrial Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/17/2014.(mjwcd)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER REGARDING SUMISSIONS OF PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Plaintiff and Defendants shall each submit Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law within 14 days after the transcript of the February 3-4, 2014 hearing is filed with the court. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ronald J Hedges on 2/11/2014. (kweck)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER. ORDERED that National Jewish Health's Unopposed Motion To Restrict Access (Level 1) Pursuant To Local Rule 7.2 [122-1] is GRANTED. ORDERED that the defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment [ECF Nos. 101 & 103] is STRICKEN fr om the record. The defendants shall file the new redacted version of their Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, along with any and all unrestricted attachments, as one filing on or before Monday, February 3, 2014. In a separate filing, the defendants shall file all restricted attachments relating to their Motion For Partial Summary Judgment and shall do so on or before Monday, February 3, 2014 by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/29/14.(jhawk, )
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER denying 83 Defendants' Rule 37 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Untimely Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures or in the Alternative for Plaintiff to Pay Defendants' Fees and Costs Caused by the Untimely Disclosures and Request for Oral Argument, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/6/2013.(mjwcd)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MIJNUTE ORDER granting 79 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations on Their Response in Opposition to Motion for Rule 37Sanctions, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/21/2013.(mjwcd)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying 50 Motion for Sanctions, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/26/2013.(trlee, )
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER granting 67 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 24 is amended to permit defendants to re-open the deposition of Dr. Amy Lukowski as set forth in the order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/16/2013.(mjwcd)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Motion Hearing held on 8/13/2013.Taking under advisement 50 Defendants Motion for Sanctions or to Compel [Docket No. 50, Filed July 19, 2013 /Restricted Document Docket No. 49] Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (mjwcd)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER granting 55 parties' Joint Motion Pursuant to Local Rule 30.1 for Leave to Notice Third Party Depositions, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/12/2013.(mjwcd)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 JOINT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/10/2013. (mjwcd)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer. The tendered Amended Answer (Docket No. 29-1) is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 02/28/13.(jjhsl, )
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JOINT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/20/2013. (mjwcd)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/1/2012. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Jewish Health v. WebMD Health Services Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Jewish Health
Represented By: James Lewis Wooll
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Stewart
Represented By: Gary Robin Maze
Represented By: Kristina Mariana Kalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebMD Health Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E. Lacis
Represented By: K. C. Groves, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebMD Health Corp.
Represented By: K. C. Groves, Jr.
Represented By: Mark E. Lacis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?