Rodriguez v. Marauder Corporation
Plaintiff: Marina Rodriguez
Defendant: Marauder Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012cv02895
Filed: November 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: the plaintiff shall file on or before 10/30/2013, if at all, anadditional affidavit in support of her 28 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Marauder Corporation which satisfies all of the requirements of MSK Civ.Practice Standard V.J. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/16/2013. (klyon, )
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Deadline. The Scheduling Conference set for February 20, 2013, and all related deadlines, are VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/11/13.(mjgsl, )
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING. Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/6/2012. (klyon, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Marauder Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Rodriguez
Represented By: Joseph Michael Panvini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marauder Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?