Kissing Camels Surgery Center, LLC et al v. HCA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kissing Camels Surgery Center, LLC, Cherry Creek Surgery Center, LLC, Hampden Surgery Center, LLC and Arapahoe Surgery Center, LLC
Defendant: HCA Inc., HCA - HealthONE LLC, Centura Health Corporation, Colorado Ambulatory Surgical Center Association, Inc. and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2012cv03012
Filed: November 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/22/16. Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike Defendants' First Set Of Interrogatories And Second Requests For Production Of Documents 366 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (bsimm, )
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 386 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Discovery/Status Conference held on 1/21/2016 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Counterclaim Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Counterclaim Plaintiffs' First S et of Interrogatories and Second requests for Production of Document 380 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept the Reply [380-1]. The Motion to Strike Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Second Requests for Producti on of Documents 366 is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART as stated on the record. Status Report due by 2/11/2016. Status Conference set for 2/23/2016 10:00 AM for two hours in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, )
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/22/15 DENYING 347 Motion to Stay Discovery; and GRANTING 316 Motion for Order Joining SurgCenter as Counterclaim Defendant, (nmarb, )
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MINUTE ORDER granting 338 Motion to Withdraw by David A. DeMarco, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/03/15.(nmarb, )
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER denying 229 Centura's Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge William J. Martinez on 08/28/2015.(cthom, )
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER Denying Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Ordered that the Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc, d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Colorado 259 , UnitedHealthCare of Colorado, Inc. 260 , Colorado Ambulatory Surgery Center Association, Inc. 261 , and Aetna, Inc. 264 are DENIED. Ordered that the Motion to Dismiss filed by Audubon Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC 266 is DENIED AS MOOT by Judge William J. Martinez on 06/16/15.(jhawk, )
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MINUTE ORDER granting in part 291 Joint Motion to Vacate or Extend Pretrial Deadlines. The 4/14/2015 Final Pretrial Conference is converted to a Status Conference, which will be held at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/31/2015.(alowe) Modified text on 3/31/2015 (alowe).
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER OVERRULING IN PART AND SUSTAINING IN PART DISMISSED DEFENDANTS' 218 OBJECTION TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER: The Magistrate Judge's 212 Order is VACATED as an Order and is instead construed as a Report and Recommendation, which i s ADOPTED in PART. The 177 Dismissal Order is AMENEDED to state that all claims dismissed therein for failure to state a claim are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' 181 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED, and the 213 Second Amended Complaint is ACCEPTED AS FILED. The Dismissed Defendants shall file an Answer or responsive pleading to the Second Amended Complaint on or before 11/26/2014. By Judge William J. Martinez on 11/4/2014. (alowe)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER denying 227 Centuras Motion to Stay Resolution of the Dismissed Defendants Objection, by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/3/2014.(evana, )
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER Granting Dismissed Defendants' Colorado Ambulatory Surgery Center Association, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc, d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Colorado, UnitedHealthcare of Colorado, Inc., Audubon Ambul atory Surgical Center, LLC, and Aetna, Inc. Motion for Stay and Construing Notice as Objection. Therefore, the Court hereby GRANTS that portion of the Motion, and the Dismissed Defendants deadline to file their answer to the Second Amended Compla int shall be stayed pending the resolution of the Objection. As the Court has construed the remaining arguments in the Motion as an Objection to the Magistrate Judges Order, Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file any response to the Objection on or before September 3, 2014, pursuant to Rule 72(b)(2). The Dismissed Defendants shall file any Reply on or before September 10, 2014, by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/21/2014. (evana, )
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting 181 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/12/2014.(evana, )
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/7/14. Centura's Motion to Compel Production In Response to Subpoena to Surgical Center Development, Inc. 199 is GRANTED; and on or before August 21, 2014, the parties shall notify me as to the date by which compliance with this order will be completed. (bsimm, )
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MINUTE ORDER granting 186 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Substitute Exhibits by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/12/2014.(evana, )
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER The Motion to Dismiss filed by Centura Health Corporation ECF No. 94 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; The Motions to Dismiss filed by Colorado Ambulatory Surgery Center Association, Inc. ECF No. 88 , Aetna, Inc. ECF No. 112 , Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc, d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Colorado ECF No. 113 , Audubon Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC ECF No. 114 , and UnitedHealthCare of Colorado, Inc. ECF No. 128 are GRANTED, and all claims against these Defendants are DISMISSED; The Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants HCA, Inc. and HCA-HealthONE LLC ECF No. 91 and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Colorado ECF No. 93 are DENIED AS MOOT; This case remains pending against Centur a Health Corporation as to Plaintiffs Claims 1, 4, 5, 6, 9, and 10. The Clerk and the Parties shall amend the caption of this case in all future pleadings to reflect the fact that Centura Health Corporation remains as the sole Defendant in this action, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/13/2014.(evana, )
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MINUTE ORDER granting 152 Humana Health Plan, Inc.s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Subpoena. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and the Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing the attached Humana Health Plan, Inc.s Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of time to Respond to Plaintiffs Subpoena, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/13/2013.(ervsl, )
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/10/13. (bnbcd, )
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MINUTE ORDER granting 133 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Pretrial Deadlines. Discovery due by 2/19/2014, Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2014. Final Pretrial Conference reset to 6/10/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/3/2014. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/5/13.(bnbcd, )
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/8/13. (bnbcd, )
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER granting 65 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/3/2013.(ervsl, )
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 36 Defendant Centura Health Corporations (Centura Health) Motion for Consideration of Recusal. I find that in the circumstances of the instant action, no reasonably objective person could conclude that my contractual relationship with the President and CEO of non-party Catholic Health raises an appearance of bias on my part. Accordingly, the Motion is DENIED, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/25/2013.(ervsl, )
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/6/2012. (ervsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kissing Camels Surgery Center, LLC et al v. HCA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kissing Camels Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherry Creek Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hampden Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arapahoe Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA - HealthONE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centura Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Ambulatory Surgical Center Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?