Baker v. Banner Health et al

Plaintiff: Martha L. Baker
Defendant: Banner Health and Banner Medical Group Colorado
Interested_party: USA
Case Number: 1:2012cv03029
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 - False Claims Act -- Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2016 91 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES. re: 90 , by clerk on 11/15/2016. (dhans, ) Modified to change document type to "opinion" on 11/16/2016 (cthom, ).
June 29, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 60 Motion for Reconsideration by Judge William J. Martinez on 06/29/2015.(cthom, )
May 28, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Bakers Early Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/27/2015.(evana, )
December 16, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/16/14. ORDERED that when filing restricted documents, parties MUST fully comply with the requirements of D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.2. (cbssec)
July 31, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER on the Governments Motion to Unrestrict Case and Maintain Level 2 Restriction of Certain Pleadings. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to unrestrict this case and all fillings except docket entries at ECF Nos. 10 and 12, which shall remain RESTRICTED with a restriction Level 2, by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/31/2014. (evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Banner Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha L. Baker
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Medical Group Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: USA
Represented By: Marcy Elizabeth Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?